This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:34:32 (UTC).

STEPHENSON v. C.R. BARD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 STEPHENSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R BARD, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05777

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA STEPHENSON

Defendants

ROBERT SINGH, M.D.

C.R. BARD, INC.

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARRIE R. CAPOUELLEZ

Attorney at LOPEZ MCHUGH LLP

214 Flynn Avenue

Moorestown, NJ 08057

ERIC PRZYBYSZ

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI LAW FIRM

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

MATTHEW E. BROWN

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

One Post Office Square 30Th Fl

Boston, MA 02109

WILLIAM J. MCDONOUGH

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

Three Logan Square Suite 3100, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. MCDONOUGH on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS BERKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 18-20035. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207974)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF 1/7/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERIC PRZYBYSZ ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (DT) (ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO ERIC PRZYBYSZ) (DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

13 #1

envelope

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Hearing: Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, 4th Floor, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042 on Tuesday, January 7, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (sres, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#12

(#12) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 8) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, M.D for the following reason: unable to forward. (dt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#13

(#13) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 9) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, M.D. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DT) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW E. BROWN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(BROWN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDERS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/2020. 1/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF 12/30/2019 THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 7, 2020 AT 1:30PM (DOC.NO. 3) WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE. COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT, C.R. BARD, INC., SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/30/19. 12/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/7/20 THAT THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL FACT DISCOVERY BY MAY 6, 2020; ETC. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY AUGUST 11, 2020; OPPOSITION TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY AUGUST 25, 2020; THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM BY SEPTEMBER 23, 2020; MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY SEPTEMBER 23, 2020; RESPONSES TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY SEPTEMBER 30, 2020; A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2020 10:00 AM. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 10/9/2020 09:30 AM IN PHILADELPHIA BEFORE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH, COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. TRIAL SET FOR 10/13/2020 09:00AM IN EASTON. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRIAL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eric Przybysz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14025488.) filed by LINDA STEPHENSON.Cert. of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAPOUELLEZ, CARRIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#11

(#11) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 7) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, MD for the following reason: unable to forward. (dt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 9) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, M.D. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DT) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 8) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, M.D for the following reason: unable to forward. (dt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/20 (Document # 7) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Robert M. Singh, MD for the following reason: unable to forward. (dt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH. Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/20. (DT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDERS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/2020. 1/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/7/20 THAT THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL FACT DISCOVERY BY MAY 6, 2020; ETC. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY AUGUST 11, 2020; OPPOSITION TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS BY AUGUST 25, 2020; THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM BY SEPTEMBER 23, 2020; MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY SEPTEMBER 23, 2020; RESPONSES TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY SEPTEMBER 30, 2020; A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2020 10:00 AM. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 10/9/2020 09:30 AM IN PHILADELPHIA BEFORE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH, COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. TRIAL SET FOR 10/13/2020 09:00AM IN EASTON. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRIAL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF 1/7/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERIC PRZYBYSZ ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (DT) (ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO ERIC PRZYBYSZ) (DT) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dt, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eric Przybysz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14025488.) filed by LINDA STEPHENSON.Cert. of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAPOUELLEZ, CARRIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF 12/30/2019 THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 7, 2020 AT 1:30PM (DOC.NO. 3) WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE. COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT, C.R. BARD, INC., SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/30/19. 12/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW E. BROWN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(BROWN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Hearing: Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, 4th Floor, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042 on Tuesday, January 7, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (sres, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. MCDONOUGH on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C.R. BARD, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS BERKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 18-20035. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207974)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.