This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:42:41 (UTC).

Stephens v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Stephens filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Stephens

Defendant

Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Virden Mallett

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Miller

1601 South Broadway

Little Rock, AR 72206

Defendant Attorneys

Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Baxter D. Drennon

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Pamela Stephens with Jury Demand against Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (bmd) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-8629. Fee $400 receipt number LIT075498. (bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed by Pamela Stephens with Jury Demand against Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (bmd) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-8629. Fee $400 receipt number LIT075498. (bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.