This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:33:55 (UTC).

Stephens v. Squirrels LLC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Stephens filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Squirrels LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Lee and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Lee

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAVONUNA P. STEPHENS

Javonuna P Stephens

Defendants

SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS

Squirrels LLC

Express Services Inc

Express Services Inc doing business as Express Employment Professionals

Squirrels LLC doing business as Express Employment Professionals

Not Classified By Court

Anthony Stites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Cathy T Serrano

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

John A Drake

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jeffrey W Parker, Jr

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/14/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/30/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 6/30/2020; and from defendant by 7/30/2020. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 2/7/2020 and for Defendant is 2/21/2020. The parties have selected Anthony Stites as the mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/14/2020. (mrm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Parker, Jr on behalf of Express Services Inc, Squirrels LLC (Parker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Javonuna P Stephens (Serrano, Cathy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#16

(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Squirrels LLC.(Drake, John) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Rights

#15

(#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Services, Inc., filed by Javonuna P Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Rights)(Myers, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2020 to correct text (lhc). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Javonuna P Stephens. Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 1/17/2020, to file the first amended complaint (ECF #11 -1) and exhibit (ECF #11 -2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/10/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Javonuna P Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Rights)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS. (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS - Proof of Service and Proof of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Drake on behalf of SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4070121.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1911-CT-000592, filed by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/14/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/30/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 6/30/2020; and from defendant by 7/30/2020. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 2/7/2020 and for Defendant is 2/21/2020. The parties have selected Anthony Stites as the mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/14/2020. (mrm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Cathy Serrano. Atty John Drake and Sue Gooden appeared on behalf of Dft. The #12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 9/30/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Drake. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/3/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Parker, Jr on behalf of Express Services Inc, Squirrels LLC (Parker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Javonuna P Stephens (Serrano, Cathy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Squirrels LLC.(Drake, John) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Services, Inc., filed by Javonuna P Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Rights)(Myers, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2020 to correct text (lhc). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Javonuna P Stephens. Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 1/17/2020, to file the first amended complaint (ECF #11 -1) and exhibit (ECF #11 -2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/10/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE of Attorney of anticipated fees and expenses. (Drake, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Javonuna P Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination and Notice of Rights)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to #8 Agreed Notice, Dfts Answer is due by 1/3/2020. (mrm) Modified on 11/26/2019 to change verbage (mrm). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference - Agreed by Defendant Squirrels LLC. (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Squirrels LLC ; answer due by January 3, 2020. (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS. (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS - Proof of Service and Proof of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Drake on behalf of SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS (Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4070121.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1911-CT-000592, filed by SQUIRRELS LLC, d/b/a EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drake, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPRESS SERVICES INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cathy T Serrano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher C Myers