Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 10:43:51 (UTC).

Stephens v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Stephens filed an Other lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02633

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lue Stephens

Defendant

Apple Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Weldy

Attorney at Weldy Law Firm PLLC

1438 N. State Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Defendant Attorney

Sanford G. Hooper

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00055. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to MDL; Case Transferred to District of Northern California. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/21. (bnd) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 days by Apple, Inc.. (Hooper, Sanford) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. E-mailed to Attorney for service. (tab) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1922442, filed by Lue Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00055. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to MDL; Case Transferred to District of Northern California. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/21. (bnd) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 days by Apple, Inc.. (Hooper, Sanford) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. E-mailed to Attorney for service. (tab) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1922442, filed by Lue Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Weldy