This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 07:01:48 (UTC).

Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros. Real Estate Invest. Assoc. a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA: Cover v. Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administr

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros Real Estate Invest Assoc a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA Cover filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03247

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros. Real Estate Invest. Assoc. a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA: Cover

STEPHANO BROTHERS REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT ASSOCIATES, LLP doing business as COVERED BRIDGE APARTMENTS also known as STEPHANO BROS. REAL ESTATE INVEST. ASSOC. also known as STEPHANO BROTHERS REAL ESTATE ASSOCIATES/LLP DBA: COVERED BRIDGE APTS

STEPHANO BROS. REAL ESTATE INVEST. ASSOC.

STEPHANO BROTHERS REAL ESTATE ASSOCIATES

Defendants

Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator of the National Flood Insurance Program

NFIP Direct Servicing Agent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD M. OCHROCH

Attorney at OCHROCH & ASSOC., P.C.

318 South 16Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

NILS BURTON SNELL

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA STEVENS OF CANNADA PLLC

500 Office Center Dr Ste 400

Ft Washington, PA 19034

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT NFIP DIRECT SERVICING AGENT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. NFIP DIRECT SERVICING AGENT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 9/27/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/17/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

1 #17

Exhibit N

1 #16

Exhibit M

1 #15

Exhibit L

1 #12

Exhibit I

1 #11

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator of the National Flood Insurance Program, NFIP Direct Servicing Agent ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15266900.), filed by Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros. Real Estate Invest. Assoc. a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA: Cover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N)(OCHROCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT NFIP DIRECT SERVICING AGENT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. NFIP DIRECT SERVICING AGENT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 9/27/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/17/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Attorney),,, filed by NFIP Direct Servicing Agent.Certificate of Uncontested Motion, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SNELL, NILS) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service (OCHROCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (JL) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator of the National Flood Insurance Program, NFIP Direct Servicing Agent, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/22/21. SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUSA E-MAILED ON 7/22/21. (bw, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of of Disclosure (Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1) by Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros. Real Estate Invest. Assoc. a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA: Cover. (OCHROCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator of the National Flood Insurance Program, NFIP Direct Servicing Agent ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15266900.), filed by Stephano Brothers Real Estate Investment Associates, LLP d/b/a Covered Bridge Apartments a/k/a Stephano Bros. Real Estate Invest. Assoc. a/k/a Stephano Brothers Real Estate Associates / LLP DBA: Cover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N)(OCHROCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant