This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 09:32:44 (UTC).

Stephanie Magur v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Stephanie Magur filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06463

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Magur

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph A Kaufman

Attorney at Lemon Law Aid Inc

117 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 340

Pasadena, CA 91105

Raymond Velarde

Attorney at Lemon Law Aid Inc

117 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 340

Pasadena, CA 91105

Defendant Attorneys

Behrouz Shareghi Arani

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Declaration Behrouz S. Arani

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#3

#4

#2

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 2/8/2021. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 5/10/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions by 6/7/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine set for 8/23/2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 3 to 4 Days) set for 9/14/2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 11:00am. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Magur.. (Kaufman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 09/14/20 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 served on July 21, 2020. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Stephanie Magur. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV22693 Receipt No: ACACDC-27281565 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Behrouz S. Arani, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Behrouz Shareghi Arani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman