This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2019 at 08:05:20 (UTC).

Stellar Group, Inc. v. Stellar Construction Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Stellar Group, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Stellar Construction Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01135

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stellar Group, Inc.

Defendant

Stellar Construction Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trace Hunter Jackson

Attorney at Rogers Towers, P.A.

Suite 1500, 1301 Riverplace Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-9000

Brian George Kelley

Attorney at Rogers Towers, P.A.

Suite 1500, 1301 Riverplace Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-9000

Joseph P. Kincart

Attorney at Rogers Towers, P.A.

1301 Riverplace Blvd., Suite 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32297

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Case Management Report Form

5 #2

Consent Letter and Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE to counsel Joseph Kincart of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (AEJ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Stellar Construction Management, LLC. (AEJ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1135-J-39PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Stellar Construction Management, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15990869) filed by Stellar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Jackson, Trace) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLAR GROUP PTY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trace Hunter Jackson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian George Kelley