This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:51:07 (UTC).

Stein v. Exterran Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Stein filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Exterran Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02311

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shiva Stein

Defendants

Exterran Corporation

Mark R. Sotir

Andrew J. Way

William M. Goodyear

James C. Gouin

John P. Ryan

Christopher T. Seaver

Hatem Soliman

Ieda Gomes Yell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gloria Kui Melwani

1180 Avenue Of The Americas, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Richard T. Marooney, Jr

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (NYC)

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Exterran Corporation, William M. Goodyear, James C. Gouin, John P. Ryan, Christopher T. Seaver, Hatem Soliman, Mark R. Sotir, Andrew J. Way, Ieda Gomes Yell. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25897273)Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melwani, Gloria) Modified on 3/23/2022 (vf). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Exterran Corporation waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; William M. Goodyear waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; James C. Gouin waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; John P. Ryan waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Christopher T. Seaver waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Hatem Soliman waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Mark R. Sotir waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Andrew J. Way waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Ieda Gomes Yell waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time To Respond To

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 8/31/2022 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard T. Marooney, Esq. dated 5/13/2022. Document filed by Exterran Corporation, William M. Goodyear, James C. Gouin, John P. Ryan, Christopher T. Seaver, Hatem Soliman, Mark R. Sotir, Andrew J. Way, Ieda Gomes Yell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time To Respond To The Complaint).(Marooney, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Exterran Corporation waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; William M. Goodyear waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; James C. Gouin waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; John P. Ryan waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Christopher T. Seaver waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Hatem Soliman waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Mark R. Sotir waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Andrew J. Way waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Ieda Gomes Yell waiver sent on 3/25/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gloria Kui Melwani to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Civil Cover Sheet is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melwani, Gloria) Modified on 3/23/2022 (vf). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Exterran Corporation, William M. Goodyear, James C. Gouin, John P. Ryan, Christopher T. Seaver, Hatem Soliman, Mark R. Sotir, Andrew J. Way, Ieda Gomes Yell. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25897273)Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Melwani, Gloria) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exterran Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard T. Marooney