This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 07:56:54 (UTC).

STEIN v. ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 STEIN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01168

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER STEIN

Defendants

ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES

SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLETUS P. LYMAN

1612 Latimer Street

Phila, PA 19103-6307

MICHAEL S. FETTNER

1612 Latimer Street

Phila, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

EMILY SANTORO

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

1735 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PHILIP K. KONTUL

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

One Ppg Place, Suite 1900

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by CLETUS P. LYMAN on behalf of WALTER STEIN (LYMAN, CLETUS) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER STEIN. ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (FETTNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER STEIN. SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (FETTNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY SANTORO on behalf of ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES, SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC with Certificate of Service(SANTORO, EMILY) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned matter for FRIDAY, JUNE 8, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042. (sres) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP K. KONTUL on behalf of ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES, SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC (KONTUL, PHILIP) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF AMENDED INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that the initial pretrial conference scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned matter is for WEDNESDAY, JUNE 8, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042. (sres) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF AMENDED INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that the initial pretrial conference scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned matter is for WEDNESDAY, JUNE 8, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042. (sres) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP K. KONTUL on behalf of ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES, SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC (KONTUL, PHILIP) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned matter for FRIDAY, JUNE 8, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042. (sres) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY SANTORO on behalf of ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES, SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC with Certificate of Service(SANTORO, EMILY) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER STEIN. SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (FETTNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER STEIN. ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (FETTNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by CLETUS P. LYMAN on behalf of WALTER STEIN (LYMAN, CLETUS) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES, SHERIDAN ANESTHESIA SERVICES OF PENNSYLVANIA, PC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/28/22 (dt) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WALTER STEIN, $402 FILING FEE PAID RECEIPT NUMBER APAEDC-15817479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FETTNER, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/28/2022 (ke). (Attachment 1 rCOMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WALTER STEIN, $402 FILING FEE PAID RECEIPT NUMBER APAEDC-15817479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FETTNER, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/28/2022 (ke). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/28/2022) (sbt). eplaced on 3/28/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip K. Kontul