This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2023 at 07:07:09 (UTC).

Stein v. Albertsons LLC

Case Summary

On 01/01/2023 Stein filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Albertsons LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harriet Stein

Defendant

Albertsons LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin M. Hanratty

Attorney at Hanratty Law Group

1815 Village Center Circle, Suite 140

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Defendant Attorneys

Jack P. Burden

Attorney at Backus Carranza

3050 South Durango Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Dallin Knecht

3050 S Durango Dr, Las Vegas Nv

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Lisa M. Szyc

Attorney at Spilotro and Kulla, Chtd.

626 South Third Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 8/29/2023. Motions due by 9/28/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Albertsons LLC. (Burden, Jack) (other) (discovery) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the #7 Order to Show Cause is satisfied and I will not remand this action to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertsons LLC.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

8 #5

Exhibit D

8 #4

Exhibit C

8 #3

Exhibit B

8 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Index Index

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Albertsons LLC to show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 1/20/2023 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Harriet Stein that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Hanratty, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated January 3, 2023 by Albertsons LLC re #3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertsons LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Safeway Inc., Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC, Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's Companies, Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Other Affiliate Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC for Albertsons LLC added.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/3/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/18/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #2

Index Index

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 8/29/2023. Motions due by 9/28/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Albertsons LLC. (Burden, Jack) (other) (discovery) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the #7 Order to Show Cause is satisfied and I will not remand this action to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertsons LLC.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Albertsons LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Albertsons LLC to show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 1/20/2023 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Harriet Stein that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Hanratty, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated January 3, 2023 by Albertsons LLC re #3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertsons LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Safeway Inc., Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC, Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's Companies, Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Other Affiliate Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC for Albertsons LLC added.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/3/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/18/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (KF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-22860941-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7160316) by Albertsons LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Errata G, #10 Exhibit H) (Burden, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less