This case was last updated from PACER on 01/02/2021 at 07:17:20 (UTC).

Steffenson v. Arovast Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Steffenson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Arovast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06536

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Becky Steffenson

Defendants

Arovast Corporation d/b/a Cosori Corporation

Arovast Corporation a California Corporation doing business as Cosori Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loren Michael Legorreta

Attorney at Tomasik Kotin Kasserman LLC

Suite 3050, 161 N Clark, Suite 3050

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorney

Stephen W. Heil

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service Propounding Discovery on Plaintiff by Stephen W. Heil on behalf of Arovast Corporation (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#9

(#9) Defendant Arovast Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arovast Corporation(Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's agreed motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading #6 is granted to 12/17/20. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#7

(#7) JURY Demand (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendant Arovast Corporation for extension of time to File Responsive Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arovast Corporation by Stephen W. Heil (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Steffenson as to Arovast Corporation on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Kress, Adam) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/18/2020) (lma, ). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Becky Steffenson by Loren Michael Legorreta (Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Becky Steffenson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17606997. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service Propounding Discovery on Plaintiff by Stephen W. Heil on behalf of Arovast Corporation (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant Arovast Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arovast Corporation(Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's agreed motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading #6 is granted to 12/17/20. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JURY Demand (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Defendant Arovast Corporation for extension of time to File Responsive Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arovast Corporation by Stephen W. Heil (Heil, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Steffenson as to Arovast Corporation on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Kress, Adam) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/18/2020) (lma, ). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Arovast Corporation d/b/a Cosori Corporation. (lxk, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Becky Steffenson by Loren Michael Legorreta (Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Becky Steffenson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17606997. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Legorreta, Loren) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arovast Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen W. Heil