This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2023 at 10:04:36 (UTC).

Steen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Steen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00361

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Steen

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory D. Swartwood

Defendant Attorney

Jeannine Cline Jacobson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - venue

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (MCB) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/23/2023. (ABC) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kimberly Steen. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kimberly Steen. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2023 by Kimberly Steen as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant's Response due by 4/10/2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/24/2023. (JDE) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2023 by Kimberly Steen as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kimberly Steen. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kimberly Steen. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/23/2023. (ABC) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (MCB) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:23-cv-0361-CEH-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20523741) filed by Kimberly Steen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - venue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less