This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2021 at 08:04:03 (UTC).

Myra Steen et al v. American National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Myra Steen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11226

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Myra Steen

Janet Williams

Defendant

American National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig M Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Jack B Winters, Jr

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Sarah Ball

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Capielo

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Tarifa Belle Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American National Insurance Company identifying American National Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#13

(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American National Insurance Company answer now due 2/4/2021, filed by Defendant American National Insurance Company.(Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party American National Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Myra Steen, Janet Williams, upon Defendant American National Insurance Company served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant American National Insurance Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant American National Insurance Company. (car) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29463876 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Myra Steen, Janet Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Myra Steen(pty:pla), Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Janet Williams(pty:pla))(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case filed by Defendant American National Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American National Insurance Company identifying American National Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American National Insurance Company answer now due 2/4/2021, filed by Defendant American National Insurance Company.(Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party American National Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Myra Steen, Janet Williams, upon Defendant American National Insurance Company served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant American National Insurance Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant American National Insurance Company. (car) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Georg Capielo on behalf of Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams (Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Myra Steen(pty:pla), Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Janet Williams(pty:pla))(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Ball on behalf of Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams (Attorney Sarah Ball added to party Myra Steen(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah Ball added to party Janet Williams(pty:pla))(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jack B Winters, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams (Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Myra Steen(pty:pla), Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Janet Williams(pty:pla))(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams, (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Myra Steen, Janet Williams. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29463876 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Myra Steen, Janet Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Myra Steen(pty:pla), Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Janet Williams(pty:pla))(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tarifa Belle Laddon