This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2020 at 13:47:04 (UTC).

STEELERS KEYS, LLC et al v. HIGH TECH NATIONAL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 STEELERS KEYS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HIGH TECH NATIONAL, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-22857

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Consolidated Defendants

Randy Fieler

Juan Moore

David Slinger

Kenneth Garbez

Rodisbel Alvarez

Steelers Keys LLC

Jay Wiener

Defendants and Consolidated Plaintiffs

Automotive Key Controls, LLC

High Tech National LLC doing business as High Tech Locksmiths

KAR Auction Services Inc.

ADESA Inc.

CarJoe, LLC

Speedy Keys and Recovery Corp.

Josue Almonte

All Recovery Solutions, Inc.

Charles Stead

Eric Taube

Michael Leader

AANGO, LLC

Bernard Murphy

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur Robert Weaver

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Jonathan Edward Gale

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Blvd., 30Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

James Anthony Gale

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

2 South Biscayne Blvd, 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Matthew Neil Horowitz

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Dana Jane McElroy

Attorney at Thomas & LoCicero PL

915 Middle River Drive, Suite 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Blaine C. Kimrey

Attorney at Vedder Price, PC

222 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

James Piatt

Attorney at Riley Williams & Piatt, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 300

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jonathon P. Reinisch

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Bryan K. Clark

Attorney at Vedder Price PC

222 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Marianne Curtis

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Marianne Curtis

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Kenneth Wayne Waterway

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Suite 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Leonard Keith Samuels

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

92 #17

Exhibit Ex. Q

92 #16

Exhibit Ex. P

92 #15

Exhibit Ex. O

92 #14

Exhibit Ex. N

92 #13

Exhibit Ex. M

92 #12

Exhibit Ex. L

92 #9

Exhibit Ex. I

92 #5

Exhibit Ex. E

92 #4

Exhibit Ex. D

1 #10

Exhibit E

1 #9

Exhibit D

1 #8

Exhibit C

1 #7

Exhibit B

1 #4

Summon(s) Kar Auction Services

1 #3

Summon(s) Automotive Key Controls

1 #2

Summon(s) High Tech

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

208 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Dismiss #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT / Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National LLC. Replies due by 9/17/2020. (McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) NOTICE of Compliance / Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance by Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National LLC re 109 Notice re Hearing,. Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Automotive Key Controls, LLC(pty:conpla), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party High Tech National LLC(pty:conpla). (McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#109) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Telephonic Discovery Hearing: A Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for 9/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties shall call the following toll-free number: 1-888-684-8852 (access code 5264742#) (security code 1231#). (js02) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS DECLARATORY RELIEF CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2) by Rodisbel Alvarez, Kenneth Garbez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys LLC, Randy Fieler. Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Rodisbel Alvarez(pty:condft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Kenneth Garbez(pty:condft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Juan Moore(pty:condft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party David Slinger(pty:condft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Steelers Keys LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Randy Fieler(pty:condft). Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Curtis, Marianne) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by High Tech National LLC, Automotive Key Controls, LLC. Steven Metzmeier served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Allan Wiener served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Return of Service)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) PAPERLESS ORDER TO RESPOND: The Plaintiffs are directed to respond to the Defendants' opposed motion for extension of time to file its answer. #105 . Plaintiffs are directed to respond by September 11, 2020 and should address why consolidated briefing is appropriate in this case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME by AANGO, LLC, Josue Almonte, Brian Bass, CET, LLC d/b/a Autolocks USA, CarJoe, LLC, Johanna Castillo, Nicole Castillo, Chris Howard, KeyGenix, LLC, Michael Leader, Steven Metzmeier, Bernard Murphy, OnSite Central, LLC, Donald Schultz, Charles Stead, Steelers Recovery and Security, Inc., Eric Taube, Chad Ware, Allan Wiener. Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party AANGO, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Josue Almonte(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Brian Bass(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party CET, LLC d/b/a Autolocks USA(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party CarJoe, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Johanna Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Nicole Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Chris Howard(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party KeyGenix, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Michael Leader(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Steven Metzmeier(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Bernard Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party OnSite Central, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Donald Schultz(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Charles Stead(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Steelers Recovery and Security, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Eric Taube(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Chad Ware(pty:dft), Attorney Marianne Curtis added to party Allan Wiener(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Marianne) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by High Tech National LLC, Automotive Key Controls, LLC. CarJoe, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020; Nicole Castillo served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020; KeyGenix, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020; OnSite Central, LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Return of Service, #4 Exhibit Return of Service)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MOTION to Dismiss #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rodisbel Alvarez, Kenneth Garbez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys LLC, Jay Wiener. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Curtis, Marianne) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #92 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by High Tech National LLC, Automotive Key Controls, LLC. AANGO, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020; Apex Solution Services, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; CET, LLC d/b/a Autolocks USA served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020; Michael Leader served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Bernard Murphy served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Donald Schultz served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Charles Stead served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Steelers Recovery and Security, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Eric Taube served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Return of Service, #4 Exhibit Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Return of Service, #6 Exhibit Return of Service, #7 Exhibit Return of Service, #8 Exhibit Return of Service, #9 Exhibit Return of Service)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Adesa, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Automotive Key Controls, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party High Tech National, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Kar Auction Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McElroy, Dana) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Adesa, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. High Tech National, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Kar Auction Services, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Automotive Key Controls, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC d/b/a High Tech Locksmiths, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11945189, filed by Randy Fieler, Rodisbel Alvarez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys, LLC, Kenneth Garbez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) High Tech, #3 Summon(s) Automotive Key Controls, #4 Summon(s) Kar Auction Services, #5 Summon(s) Adesa, Inc., #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(Gale, James) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Automotive Key Controls, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAR Auction Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant