This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:32:45 (UTC).

Steelers Keys, LLC et al v. High Tech National, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 Steelers Keys, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against High Tech National, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-23630

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Randy Fieler

Juan Moore

David Slinger

Steelers Keys, LLC

Kenneth Garbez

Rodisbel Alvarez

Defendants

Kar Auction Services, Inc.

Automotive Key Controls, LLC

High Tech National, LLC

Adesa, Inc.

High Tech National, LLC doing business as High Tech Locksmiths

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Anthony Gale

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Matthew Neil Horowitz

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Arthur Robert Weaver

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan K. Clark

Attorney at Vedder Price PC

222 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Blaine C. Kimrey

Attorney at Vedder Price, PC

222 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathon P. Reinisch

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Dana Jane McElroy

Attorney at Thomas & LoCicero PL

915 Middle River Drive, Suite 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

#30

29 #5

Exhibit E

29 #4

Exhibit D

15 #5

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order

15 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

15 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

15 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#15

1 #9

Exhibit D

1 #8

Exhibit C

1 #7

Exhibit B

1 #6

Exhibit A

1 #5

Summon(s) Adesa, Inc.

1 #4

Summon(s) Kar Auction Services

1 #2

Summon(s) High Tech

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Dismissal, Transfer, or Stay filed by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. (McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Dismissal, Transfer, or Stay filed by Rodisbel Alvarez, Randy Fieler, Kenneth Garbez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys, LLC. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gale, James) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) PAPERLESS ORDER: On October 16, 2019, the Plaintiffs filed an "Expedited Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference" #21 . The Court's initial order in this case requires the parties to meet and confer by October 25, 2019. The Plaintiffs are complaining that the Defendants have not made themselves available to meet and confer as required by the Court's order. They request that this Court somehow order the enforcement of an Order that has not yet been violated. And the Plaintiffs request that the Court rule by October 21, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. so they can update the court in a related case currently pending in the Southern District of Indiana regarding the status of this case. The Court finds this motion entirely inappropriate. The Court cannot enforce a deadline that has not yet lapsed. The Court cannot order the parties to confer by October 21 when the deadline is October 25, 2019. The Court will not referee every interaction between plaintiffs' counsel and defendants' counsel in this case. Every motion that has been filed to date attaches various strings of emails to show the Court that the parties were unable to confer. The Certificate of Service in the latest motion says that "Plaintiffs' counsel refused to say whether Plaintiffs' support or oppose this motion." That is also improper. The Local Rules' pre-filing conferral requirement seeks to avoid the unnecessary expenditure of judicial resources resolving motions that are not opposed. In some circumstances, the pre-filing-conference requirement allows the court to determine if it needs to wait for a response from the opposing party before ruling on the motion. Needless motions, such as the one filed by Plaintiffs' counsel in this case, are an unnecessary drain of the Courts resources. The Court admonishes counsel for both parties of their duty of courtesy and cooperation with fellow professionals for the efficient administration of our system. The Plaintiffs' motion #21 is denied. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/18/2019. (jaa) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce this Court's Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference re #5 Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Enforce this Court's Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference filed by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Blaine Kimrey)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies without prejudice #25 the Plaintiffs' motion to exceed the page limits. Plaintiffs have not complied with the Southern District of Florida's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Rule 3I(1) which states, in part: "If a document to be filed requires a motion requesting leave of Court (e.g., an amended complaint, a document to be filed out of time, or a document exceeding the page limitation), the proposed document shall be submitted as a PDF attachment to the motion." This allows a court to review the proposed filing to evaluate whether excess pages are necessary. It is the Court's experience an enlarged brief does not assist the Court because it is belabored with repetitive arguments. The Plaintiffs failed to establish some special need for excess pages, and the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (jaa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay in Excess of Page Limits by Rodisbel Alvarez, Randy Fieler, Kenneth Garbez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PAPERLESS ORDER: Given the time sensitive nature of #21 the Plaintiff's motion, the Court orders the Defendants to respond by 12 noon on October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jaa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #18 , #19 , and #20 counsels' motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Blaine C. Kimrey, Bryan K. Clark, and Jonathan P. Reinisch are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jaa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on their Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce this Court's Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference re #5 Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Rodisbel Alvarez, Randy Fieler, Kenneth Garbez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys, LLC. Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party Rodisbel Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party Randy Fieler(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party Kenneth Garbez(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party Juan Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party David Slinger(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Robert Weaver added to party Steelers Keys, LLC(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Arthur) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Adesa, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Automotive Key Controls, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party High Tech National, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Kar Auction Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Adesa, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. High Tech National, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Kar Auction Services, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steelers Keys, LLC. Automotive Key Controls, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Gale, James) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ar2) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC, Kar Auction Services, Inc. (ar2) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National, LLC d/b/a High Tech Locksmiths, Kar Auction Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11945189, filed by Randy Fieler, Rodisbel Alvarez, Juan Moore, David Slinger, Steelers Keys, LLC, Kenneth Garbez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) High Tech, #3 Summon(s) Automotive Key Controls, #4 Summon(s) Kar Auction Services, #5 Summon(s) Adesa, Inc., #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(Gale, James) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Automotive Key Controls, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAR Auction Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant