This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 08:32:57 (UTC).

Steelcase Inc. et al v. Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Steelcase Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00864

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Incorporated Steelcase

SC Transport, Incorporated

SC Transport Inc.

Steelcase Inc.

Respondent

Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Keith E. Eastland

Attorney at Miller Johnson PLC (Grand Rapids)

45 Ottawa Sw, Ste. 1100, P.O. Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0306

Patrick Michael Edsenga

Attorney at Miller Johnson PLC (Grand Rapids)

45 Ottawa Sw, Ste. 1100, P.O. Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0306

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. as to Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 (Edsenga, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (ems) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steelcase Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Fifth Third Bancorp for Steelcase Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SC Transport Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steelcase Inc. for SC Transport Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Petition to Appoint Arbitrator) against Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund filed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. as to Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 (Edsenga, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (ems) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $353.00, receipt number KZ004185; for remainder of civil filing fee (ems) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steelcase Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Fifth Third Bancorp for Steelcase Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SC Transport Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steelcase Inc. for SC Transport Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Michael Edsenga on behalf of petitioners SC Transport Inc., Steelcase Inc. (Edsenga, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $47.00 by attorney Keith E. Eastland on behalf of petitioner, receipt number AMIWDC-5664253; for filing fee (mkc) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mkc). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(DISREGARD) (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to respondent Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund (filing fee not paid) (ems) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Petition to Appoint Arbitrator) against Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund filed by Steelcase Inc., SC Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Eastland, Keith) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less