This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:40 (UTC).

Lockwood obo NS a minor v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Lockwood obo NS a minor filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03404

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicholas Terry Steed, Jr

April Lockwood

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Party

Social Security Administrative Record

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marie T Lowery

Attorney at Lowery Law Group

245 Seven Farms Drive

Charleston, SC 29492

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Lockwood. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 12/20/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Cards)(Lowery, Marie) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/6/2019.(gnan ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 3/5/2020. (gnan ) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to replace main document with corrected document provided by filing user). (gnan ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Nicholas Terry Steed, Jr. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019. No proposed order. Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(gnan ) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to replace document with corrected document provided by filing user). (gnan ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Nicholas Terry Steed, Jr. Service due by 3/5/2020.(gnan ) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to replace document with corrected document provided by filing user). (gnan ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.