This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:24:48 (UTC).

Stec v. Sam's East, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Stec filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sam's East, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Stec

Defendants

Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club #6781

Sam's Real Estate Business Trust

Sam's Club

Keller Sam's Club No. 6781

Sam's East Inc doing business as Sam's Club #6781

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse J Lotspeich

Attorney at Barnett Howard & Williams PLLC

209 W 8Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Shivani H Patel

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Marshall Searcy

Attorney at Marshall Searcy Law

950 Commerce Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6781, Sam's Club, Keller Sam's Club No. 6781. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12620688) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B state docket

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D discl stmt

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6781, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 3/18/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2022) (twd) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before 3/11/2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements; and (2) on or before 4/01/2022, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. The Court further ORDERS that failure of any party to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, up to and including dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims or granting of a default judgment, as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2022) (twd) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

(#6) ***FILED USING THE USDC EMERGENCY FILING SYSTEM*** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust filed by Joseph Stec. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning Monday, April 3, 2023 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4th Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2022; Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2022; Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/5/2022; Discovery due by 11/4/2022., Motions due by 12/5/2022., Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2023. ADR Provider, Mediator Marshall Searcy, added. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/18/2022) (sre) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shivani H Patel on behalf of Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patel, Shivani) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Patel, Shivani) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Patel, Shivani) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shivani H Patel on behalf of Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patel, Shivani) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning Monday, April 3, 2023 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4th Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2022; Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2022; Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/5/2022; Discovery due by 11/4/2022., Motions due by 12/5/2022., Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2023. ADR Provider, Mediator Marshall Searcy, added. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/18/2022) (sre) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILED USING THE USDC EMERGENCY FILING SYSTEM*** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East Inc, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust filed by Joseph Stec. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before 3/11/2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements; and (2) on or before 4/01/2022, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. The Court further ORDERS that failure of any party to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, up to and including dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims or granting of a default judgment, as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2022) (twd) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 3/18/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2022) (twd) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keller Sam's Club No. 6781, Sam's Club, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6781, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6781, Sam's Club, Keller Sam's Club No. 6781. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12620688) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAM'S REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SAM'S CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where Sam's East, Inc. is a litigant