This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2020 at 07:42:26 (UTC).

Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Retirement Security Funds filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Wells Fargo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04674

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds

Petitioners

Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi

David Coy

Handelsbanken Fonder AB

Roley Jess

DeKalb County Pension Fund

Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund

State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island

Defendants

John R. Shrewsberry

C. Allen Parker

Wells Fargo & Company

Charles W. Scharf

Timothy J. Sloan

City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter E. Borkon

Petitioner Attorneys

Jonathan Daniel Uslaner

Jennifer Pafiti

Benjamin Heikali

Defendant Attorneys

Sverker K. Hogberg

Brendan P. Cullen

Nanci L. Clarence

Adam F. Shearer

John T. Jasnoch

 

Court Documents

#47

#46

#45

44 #1

Proposed Order

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

8 #1

Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

PSLRA Cert and Schedule A

#1

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE per Notice of Dismissal #45 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/1/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Kim E. Miller. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds (Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Roley Jess. Responses due by 8/31/2020. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Kim) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (Miller, Kim) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Laura H. Posner by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Handelsbanken Fonder AB, Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Molly J. Bowen by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Handelsbanken Fonder AB, Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of S. Douglas Bunch by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Handelsbanken Fonder AB, Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Steven J. Toll by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Handelsbanken Fonder AB, Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Avi Josefson by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Handelsbanken Fonder AB, Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, State of Rhode Island, Office of the General Treasurer, on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam F. Shearer , Nanci L. Clarence and Josh A. Cohen (Shearer, Adam) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, and Continuing Initial CMC filed by C. Allen Parker, Charles W. Scharf, John R. Shrewsberry, Wells Fargo & Company, Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds and Timothy J. Sloan. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 8/3/2020) Modified on 8/4/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing and Service of Notice Required by 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(I) by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice)(Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds (Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Charles W. Scharf, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, Wells Fargo & Company. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds . (Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against C. Allen Parker, Charles W. Scharf, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, Wells Fargo & Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14685890.). Filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Cert and Schedule A)(Borkon, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less