This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 08:00:14 (UTC).

Steadfast Insurance Company v. ICL Group Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Steadfast Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ICL Group Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02329

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steadfast Insurance Company

Defendants

ICL Group Ltd.

Israel Chemical Limited

ICL Rotem

Rotem Amfert Negev Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yara Khaled Rashad

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon Llp

111 S Wacker Dr, Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Lynn Hagman Murray

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Brenton Warren Vincent

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

Steven Gordon Trubac

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Steadfast Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19426088.(Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steadfast Insurance Company by Lynn Hagman Murray (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Steadfast Insurance Company (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steadfast Insurance Company by Yara Khaled Rashad (Rashad, Yara) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 7/15/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 7/21/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steadfast Insurance Company as to ICL Group Ltd. on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022; ICL Rotem on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem by Steven Gordon Trubac (Trubac, Steven) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem by Brenton Warren Vincent (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem for extension of time [Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead] (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem for extension of time [Corrected Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead] (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Motion by Brenton Warren Vincent for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/31/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #12 is granted to and including 7/25/2022 to facilitate settlement discussions. Initial telephone status hearing set for 7/21/2022 is stricken and deadline for filing joint status report is extended to 7/25/2022. The Court will reset the status hearing after review of the joint status report. All deadlines obviously will be stricken if a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to any due dates. Superseded joint motion #11 is stricken as moot. Notice of motion date of 5/31/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Status Report due by 7/25/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #12 is granted to and including 7/25/2022 to facilitate settlement discussions. Initial telephone status hearing set for 7/21/2022 is stricken and deadline for filing joint status report is extended to 7/25/2022. The Court will reset the status hearing after review of the joint status report. All deadlines obviously will be stricken if a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to any due dates. Superseded joint motion #11 is stricken as moot. Notice of motion date of 5/31/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Status Report due by 7/25/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Motion by Brenton Warren Vincent for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/31/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem for extension of time [Corrected Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead] (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem for extension of time [Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead] (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem by Brenton Warren Vincent (Vincent, Brenton) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem by Steven Gordon Trubac (Trubac, Steven) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steadfast Insurance Company as to ICL Group Ltd. on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022; ICL Rotem on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 7/15/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 7/21/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ICL Group Ltd., ICL Rotem (ey, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steadfast Insurance Company by Yara Khaled Rashad (Rashad, Yara) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Steadfast Insurance Company (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steadfast Insurance Company by Lynn Hagman Murray (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Steadfast Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19426088.(Murray, Lynn) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant