This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2020 at 09:16:47 (UTC).

Stead v. Drogowski et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Stead filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Drogowski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua K. Stead

Defendants

Zachary Drogowski

Chippewa County Sheriff's Department

Michigan Department of State Police

Chippewa County

Jeffrey Rogers

Joe Wiater

Chippewa, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig W. Elhart

Attorney at Elhart & Horvath, PC

329 S Union St.

Traverse City, MI 49684-0707

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Robert de Bear

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30754

Lansing, MI 48909

Mark E. Donnelly

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Employ, Elect, Torts)

P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

Gregory R. Grant

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, PLC

310 W Front St., Ste. 221

Traverse City, MI 49684

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 to extend response deadline ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending the Time for the Filing of a Responsive Pleading by defendants Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers (Donnelly, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER; of Dismissal of Defendant Chippewa County Sheriff's Department and Dismissal of Assault & Battery Claim Against Defendant, Joe Wiater; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Chippewa County Sheriff's Department and Dismissal of Assault & Battery Claim Against Defendant, Joe Wiater by defendants Chippewa County Sheriff's Department, Chippewa, County of, Joe Wiater (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of All Defendants (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Chippewa County, Chippewa County Sheriff's Department, Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers, Joe Wiater (mlc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mlc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Joshua K. Stead (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 to extend response deadline ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending the Time for the Filing of a Responsive Pleading by defendants Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers (Donnelly, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER; of Dismissal of Defendant Chippewa County Sheriff's Department and Dismissal of Assault & Battery Claim Against Defendant, Joe Wiater; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Chippewa County Sheriff's Department and Dismissal of Assault & Battery Claim Against Defendant, Joe Wiater by defendants Chippewa County Sheriff's Department, Chippewa, County of, Joe Wiater (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Grant on behalf of defendants Chippewa County Sheriff's Department, Chippewa, County of, Joe Wiater (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of All Defendants (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Adam Robert de Bear on behalf of defendants Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers (de Bear, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark E. Donnelly on behalf of defendants Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers (Donnelly, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Chippewa County, Chippewa County Sheriff's Department, Zachary Drogowski, Michigan Department of State Police, Jeffrey Rogers, Joe Wiater (mlc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joshua K. Stead in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4625544 (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mlc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Joshua K. Stead (Elhart, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Michigan Department of State is a litigant

Latest cases where Chippewa County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam R. de Bear

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory R. Grant