This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:46:45 (UTC).

STAWARZ v. WEBB et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 STAWARZ filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against WEBB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01393

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Stawarz

Defendants

Sgt. Webb

John Does #1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F. Mizner

Attorney at Mizner Law Firm

311 West Sixth Street

Erie, PA 16507

Defendant Attorneys

Justin A. Gayle

1251 Waterfront Pl, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Justin Abraham Gayle

Attorney at PA Office of Attorney General

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Nicole J. Boland

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#7

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2021. Discovery due by 5/30/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/1/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 9/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2021. Motions due by 7/1/2022. Supplemental due by 9/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 9/23/21. (ms) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Court 3 business days prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 9/13/21. (ms) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Webb.(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to complaint by 9/10/21 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 8/11/21. (ms) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Webb YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/10/2021 (ms) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Walter Stawarz YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/10/2021 (ms) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred electronically in from Pennsylvania Western District, Case Number 2:21-cv-00195, containing electronic documents. (lg) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by WALTER STAWARZ; approving the Stipulation to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk is further ordered to transfer this action in accordance with this Order and to mark this matter closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/14/21. (ndf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Move to Middle District by WALTER STAWARZ. (Mizner, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/26/2021. (et) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEBB. WEBB waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Gayle, Justin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Gayle on behalf of WEBB. (Gayle, Justin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to WEBB. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE(S) 1-10, WEBB (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6328653), filed by WALTER STAWARZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin A. Gayle Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.