This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:32:57 (UTC).

Stavely v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Stavely filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus, Chelsey M. Vascura, Algenon L. Marbley and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04598

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Edmund A. Sargus

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judges

Chelsey M. Vascura

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY G STAVELY

Defendants

JAMES F O'NEIL III

STEVEN E STRAH

CHARLES E JONES

EBONY YEBOAH-AMANKWAH

LUIS A REYES

MICHAEL J DOWLING

JULIA L JOHNSON

DONALD T MISHEFF

Steven J Demetriou

LESLIE M TURNER

THOMAS N MITCHELL

MICHAEL J ANDERSON

CHRISTOPHER D PAPPAS

FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION

JAMES F PEARSON

SANDRA PIANALTO

ROBERT P REFFNER

K JON TAYLOR

K. Jon Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel R Mordarski

Attorney at Law Offices Of Daniel R. Mordarski LLC

5 East Long Street, Suite 1100

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher W.H. Sullivan

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Douglas L. Shively

Attorney at BakerHostetler LLP

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

F. Joseph Warin

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Carole Schwartz Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

William Scherman

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Geoffrey J. Ritts

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave.

Cleveland, OH 44114

Marjorie P Duffy

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43216

Robert Stephen Faxon

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

John A Favret, III

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

925 Euclid Ave., Suite 1150

Cleveland, OH 44115

John F McCaffrey

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Nancy G Stavely (Mordarski, Daniel) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, Michael J Dowling, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah re #15 Order, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. (daf) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit Scherman COGS

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J Dowling (Favret, John) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#15) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#36

(#16) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Nancy G. Stavely Verification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7639797), filed by NANCY G STAVELY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nancy G. Stavely Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mordarski, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (cw) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Nancy G Stavely (Mordarski, Daniel) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, Michael J Dowling, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah re #15 Order, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 13, 2020. (jlk) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/7/2020. (daf) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. (daf) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J Dowling (Favret, John) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7639797), filed by NANCY G STAVELY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nancy G. Stavely Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mordarski, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FirstEnergy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Mordarski