This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:39:40 (UTC).

Staub v. Hy-Vee, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Staub filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hy-Vee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sara Darrow and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04249

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamara Staub

Defendant

Hy-Vee, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F Doak

Attorney at KATZ NOWINSKI PC

1000 36Th Ave

Moline, IL 61265-7126

Defendant Attorney

Cameron A Davidson

Attorney at HENINGER & HENINGER PC

101 W Second St

Davenport, IA 52801

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Cameron A Davidson on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc. (Davidson, Cameron) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and JURY DEMAND by Hy-Vee, Inc..(Davidson, Cameron) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hy-Vee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3260218.), filed by Tamara Staub. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Doak, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 2/11/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/13/2020. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 2/11/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/13/2020. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and JURY DEMAND by Hy-Vee, Inc..(Davidson, Cameron) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Cameron A Davidson on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc. (Davidson, Cameron) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Staub. Hy-Vee, Inc. served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Doak, John) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued and returned to counsel to effect service. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Hy-Vee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3260218.), filed by Tamara Staub. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Doak, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.