This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:43:30 (UTC).

Staton Techiya, LLC et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On November 5, 2021, Staton Techiya, LLC (“Techiya”) and Synergy IP Corporation (“Synergy”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Bradford A. Cangro of PV Law LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., and Samsung Electronics America, Inc., (collectively, “Samsung” or “Defendants”), seeking damages, pre-judgement and post-judgment interests, disbursement, costs and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiffs. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

 

This complaint arises from Defendants’ alleged unlawful infringement of the United States Patents owned by Plaintiffs: United States Patent No. 8,111,839 (“the '839 Patent”), United States Patent No. 8,254,591 (“the ‘591 Patent”), United States Patent No. 8,315,400 (“the ‘400 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,124,982 (“the ‘982 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,270,244 (“the ‘244 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,491,542 (“the ‘542 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,609,424 (“the ‘424 Patent”), United States Patent No. 10,405,082 (“the ‘082 Patent”), United States Patent No. 10,966,015 (“the ‘015 Patent”), United States Patent No. 10,979,836 (“the ‘836 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “Samsung has and continues to make, have made, use, sell, offer for sale, import, have imported, test, design, and/or market in the United States smartphones and earphones that infringe the Asserted Patents. Samsung has directly infringed, and continues to directly infringe, the Asserted Patents under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) and (g) by making, using, selling and/or offering to sell, in this District and elsewhere in the United States, and/or importing into this District and elsewhere in the United States, certain Bixby-enabled smartphones and earphones which infringe the Asserted Patents, as further described in detail in Counts I-X, infra (collectively, “Accused Products”).”

 

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Samsung has also indirectly infringed, and continues to indirectly infringe, the Asserted Patents under 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) and (c). Samsung contributes to and induces direct infringement by Samsung's distributors, customers, and end-users. For example, on information and belief, retailers such as the Walmart Supercenter at 1701 E End Blvd N, Marshall, TX 75670 offer Accused Products for sale. Such sale and later use by purchasers results in induced and/or contributory infringement of the Asserted Patents by Samsung.”

 

Further, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “Samsung also contributes to the foregoing infringement by customers by offering to sell, selling, and importing in the United States Samsung products that constitute all or a material part of the articles that practice the Asserted Patents.”

 

There are ten claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Asserted Patents.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the Court to pass a judgment that Defendants have infringed, directly and indirectly, either literally or under the Doctrine of Equivalents, one or more claims of the Asserted Patents along with appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 including pre or post judgment interest, costs and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284 and enhanced damages and preliminary and permanent injunctive relief. Furthermore, the Plaintiffs requested the Court for attorneys’ fees and costs and any further relief as the Court may deem just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Staton Techiya, LLC

Synergy IP Corporation

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford A Cangro

Attorney at PV Law LLP

5335 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015-2052

Jacob Andrew Snodgrass

Attorney at PV Law LLP

5335 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015-2052

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston Stsuite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Robert J Gaybrick

Attorney at PV Law LLP

5335 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015-2052

Roger D Taylor

Attorney at PV Law LLP

5335 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015-2052

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal Document. ORDERED that the clerk place Dkt. No. 1 under seal, and that Exhibit A to this motion replace the original Dkt. No. 1 in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

13 #2

Text of Proposed Order

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***Joint MOTION to Seal Document by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/17/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#14) Joint MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

34 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal Document. ORDERED that the clerk place Dkt. No. 1 under seal, and that Exhibit A to this motion replace the original Dkt. No. 1 in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 2/10/2022; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to 2/10/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 13 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***Joint MOTION to Seal Document by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/17/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., filed by Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Cangro, Bradford) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Andrew Snodgrass on behalf of Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation (Snodgrass, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (klc, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (klc, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert J Gaybrick on behalf of Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8662487. (Gaybrick, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation (Cangro, Bradford) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8660995.), filed by Staton Techiya, LLC, Synergy IP Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cangro, Bradford) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith