This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 06:27:53 (UTC).

Statham v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Statham filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward J. Davila and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-04632

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Edward J. Davila

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sam Statham

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Harris Rosenstein

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys, P.C.

10866 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Alastair F. Hamblin

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys, P.C.

10866 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Sepehr Daghighian

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10866 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Won

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian Curtis Vanderhoof

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #2

Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof

1 #3

Declaration of Jonathan Won

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Certification of Interested Entities

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sepehr Daghighian (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sam Statham (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein (Rosenstein, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alastair F. Hamblin (Hamblin, Alastair) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation.. (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation and certain of its affiliates (State Street Corporation is the parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee for Ford common stock in the Ford defined co, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation. re Electronic Filing Error,, (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

(#13) NOTICE by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation of Lodging Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2022) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation of Lodging Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2022) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Docket(#12) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation and certain of its affiliates (State Street Corporation is the parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee for Ford common stock in the Ford defined co, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation. re Electronic Filing Error,, (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation.. (Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2022) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alastair F. Hamblin (Hamblin, Alastair) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein (Rosenstein, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sam Statham (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sepehr Daghighian (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Alastair F. Hamblin. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Sepehr Daghighian. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal, FO RD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Name of Interested Entities must be entered. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-5] Certification of Interested Entities, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is 22CV400000. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17433232). Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Won, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certification of Interested Entities)(Won, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2022) Modified on 8/12/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Won

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C. Vanderhoof