This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2021 at 09:21:41 (UTC).

State of Wyoming v. United States Department of Interior et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 State of Wyoming filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Interior. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly H Rankin, Nancy D Freudenthal and Scott W Skavdahl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

Presiding Judges

Nancy D Freudenthal

Scott W Skavdahl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

State of Wyoming

Respondents

United States Department of Interior Secretary

Bureau of Land Management Acting Director

Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director

United States Department of Interior

Nada Culver

Kim Liebhauser

Bureau of Land Management

Debra Anne Haaland

Intervenors

Conservation Colorado

Western Colorado Alliance

Western Watersheds Project

Alterra Mountain Company

Roan Creek Ranch

Hunt to Eat

Citizens for a Healthy Community

Western Spirit Cycling

Valley Organic Growers Association

WildEarth Guardians

Sierra Club

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James C Kaste

Attorney at Wyoming Attorney General's Office

109 State Capitol

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Travis Steven Jordan

Attorney at WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

109 State Capitol

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Sawyer

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, ENRD, NRS

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Nicholas Vassallo

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

P O Box 668

Cheyenne, WY 82003-0668

Intervenor Attorneys

Thomas R. Delehanty

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

633 17Th Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Shannon Anderson

Attorney at POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL

934 North Main Street

Sheridan, WY 82801

Robin Cooley

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

633 17Th Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Michael S Freeman

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

633 17Th Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202-3625

Kellan Richard Smith

Attorney at Public Justice

475 14Th Street, Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612

Neil Levine

Attorney at PUBLIC JUSTICE PC

475 14Th Street, Suite 610

Oakland, CA 94612

Bruce T Moats

2515 Pioneer Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Kyle James Tisdel

Attorney at WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER

208 Paseo Del Pueblo Sur, Unit #602

Taos, NM 87571

Melissa A Hornbein

Attorney at WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER

103 Reeder'S Alley

Helena, MT 59601

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#56

#55

#54

#53

#49

#48

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) GLOBAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTIONS (Doc. 41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; Doc. 44 in 0:21-cv-00056) by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for details. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #52 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. It is ORDERED that the State of Wyoming's Motion to Consolidate Civil Cases (21CV56 Doc. #52 ) is GRANTED. Case Numbers 21-CV-13-SWS and 21-CV-56- SWS are hereby consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS shall be the lead case, as reflected in the caption above. For ease of administration, all further pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS, and no further pleadings should be filed in Case No. 21-CV-56. Any further pleadings received by the Clerk of Court for Case No. 21-CV-56 shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13. (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedings; the Honorable Alan B Johnson no longer assigned to case by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #50 , #51 Motions for Extension of Time and to File Excess Pages. Intervenors shall restrict their briefing to 10 pages. Intervenors choosing to file briefs may do so by June 1, 2021. (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Travis) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delehanty, Thomas) Modified filers on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, stmo). Added filers on 5/20/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #50 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction (Court Staff, smxb) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Brief in Response to Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Kellan) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (Court Staff, smxb). Added filers on 5/17/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER granting #20 Conservation Groups' Motion to Intervene by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Hornbein, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Sawyer, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. Bureau of Land Management served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; Bureau of Land Management Acting Director served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director served on 3/26/2021, answer due on 5/25/2021; United States Department of Interior served on 3/29/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 3/29/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, U.S. Attorney General, #2 Proof of Service, Bureau of Land Management, #3 Proof of Service, Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, #4 Proof of Service Nada Culver, Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management, #5 Proof of Service, U.S. Dep't of Interior, #6 Proof of Service, Debra Haaland, Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Interior, #7 Proof of Service, Kim Liebhauser, Acting Director, Wyoming Bureau of Land Management) (Jordan, Travis) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #7 Motion for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice. Copy of order emailed to counsel on this date. (Court Staff, stmo) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/8/2021) (Court Staff, stmo). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Sawyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal (presiding). Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Kaste on behalf of State of Wyoming (Kaste, James) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Steven Jordan on behalf of State of Wyoming (Jordan, Travis) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by State of Wyoming (Filing fee $402, receipt #AWYDC-1910614) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jordan, Travis) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Watersheds Project is a litigant

Latest cases where BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant