This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:22:05 (UTC).

State of Washington et al v. Russell Vought et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 State of Washington filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Russell Vought. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John C. Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C. Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Association Of King County Historical Organizations

State of Washington

Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community

Tanana Chiefs Conference

State of Oregon

Washington Trust for Historic Preservation

Historic Seattle

Spokane Tribe of Indians

Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians

The Klamath Tribes

Skokomish Indian Tribe

Museum Of History And Industry

Suquamish Tribe

Nez Perce Tribe

Nooksack Indian Tribe

OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle

Defendants

National Archives and Records Administration

Emily W. Murphy

Office of Management and Budget

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J Lawrence

Attorney at PACIFICA LAW GROUP LLP

1191 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Nathan Bays

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Spencer W Coates

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (CRIM JUST-SEA)

800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104

Kathleen Gargan

Attorney at DORSAY & EASTON LLP

1737 Ne Alberta St Ste 208

Portland, OR 97211

Craig J Dorsay

Attorney at DORSAY & EASTON LLP

1737 Ne Alberta St., Suite 208

Portland, OR 97211

Edmund Clay Goodman

Attorney at HOBBS STRAUS DEAN & WALKER LLP

215 Sw Washington St, Ste 200

Portland, OR 97204

Earle David Lees, III

Attorney at Skokomish Tribal Attorney

N.80 Tribal Center Road

Skokomish, WA 98584

James Rittenhouse Bellis

Attorney at SUQUAMISH TRIBE

Po Box 498

Suquamish, WA 98392

Other Attorneys

Harold Chesnin

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE TRIBAL ATTORNEY (CHEHALIS)

420 Howanut Rd, Po Box 536

Oakville, WA 98568

Natalie Jean Richards Reid

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP (WA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Felecia L Shue

Attorney at PUYALLUP TRIBE OF INDIANS

3009 E. Portland Ave

Tacoma, WA 98404

Bart J. Freedman

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP (WA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 2900

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

Darin M Sands

Attorney at BRADLEY BERNSTEIN SANDS LLP (PORTLAND)

Po Box 4120, Pmb 62056

Portland, OR 97208-4120

David Stoller Hawkins

Attorney at UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

25944 Community Plaza Way

Sedro Woolley, WA 98284

Ryan David Dreveskracht

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Rogina D Beckwith

Attorney at PORT GAMBLE S'KLALLAM TRIBE

31912 Little Boston Rd Ne

Kingston, WA 98346

Heidi B Bradley

Attorney at BRADLEY BERNSTEIN SANDS LLP

113 Cherry St

Seattle, WA 98104

Lori Ellen Bruner

Attorney at TRIBAL ATTORNEY

Po Box 613

Taholah, WA 98587

Anthony S Aronica

Attorney at YAKAMA NATION OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL

Po Box 150, 401 Fort Rd

Toppenish, WA 98948

Karen D Allston

Attorney at TRIBAL ATTORNEY

Po Box 613

Taholah, WA 98587

46 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

52 #1

Exhibit A

#52

#51

#50

#49

RESTRICTED

#48

#47

#45

#36

1 #9

Summons GSA

1 #8

Summons PBRB

1 #7

Summons OMB

1 #6

Summons NARA

1 #5

Summons Murphy

1 #4

Summons Bodner

1 #3

Summons Ferriero

1 #2

Summons Vought

#1

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE - Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Decision ; filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #48 stipulation for a 60-day stay of this matter. This action shall be STAYED for 60 days from the date of this order. Defendants' cross-motion to dismiss (Dkt No. #36 ) shall remain pending before the Court throughout the duration of this stay, with the deadlines for remaining briefing on the motion also stayed during the 60-day period. The parties shall, no later than 55 days from the date of this order, file a joint report. The preliminary injunction issued by the Court (Dkt. No. #45 ) shall remain in full force and effect throughout the stay. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PM) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Bernadette Connor. Filed by Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle. (Connor, Bernadette) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/19/2021 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2021, (ND) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Stipulated MOTION - Stipulation for Order Staying Action for 60-Days; Order Thereon, filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 2/19/2021, (Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Derek Red Arrow Frank on behalf of Plaintiff Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Frank, Derek) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) PRAECIPE to attach document Signature sheet re #44 Notice of Appearance by Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle (Connor, Bernadette) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting Korematsu Center's #25 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from selling the Archives facility pursuant to duties established by FASTA and from taking any actions to facilitate or effectuate a sale of the Archives facility under FASTA until a final determination on the merits is issued by this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(MW) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #44 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Bernadette Yuan Connor. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SR) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bernadette Connor on behalf of Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle. (Connor, Bernadette) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa A Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Anderson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Harold Chesnin. Filed by Plaintiff Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation. (Chesnin, Harold) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL; 2:20-cv-1364-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lloyd B Miller for Plaintiffs Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon Ltd, and for Tanana Chiefs Conference, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lloyd B. Miller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon Ltd, Tanana Chiefs Conference (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6850085 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Attorneys Parlange and Connor (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6845618) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party American Historical Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Association Of King County Historical Organizations(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Chinese American Citizens Alliance(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Doyon, Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Duwamish Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Historic Seattle(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party HistoryLink(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Hoh Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Kalispel Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Muckleshoot Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Museum Of History And Industry(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Nez Perce Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Nooksack Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Puyallup Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Quinault Indian Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Samish Indian Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Skokomish Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Snoqualmie Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Spokane Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Squaxin Island Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Suquamish Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Swinomish Indian Tribal Community(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Tanana Chiefs Conference(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party The Klamath Tribes(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Upper Skagit Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Washington Trust for Historic Preservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Wing Luke Memorial Foundation d/b/a Wing Luke Museum(pty:pla), filed by Association Of King County Historical Organizations, American Historical Association, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Duwamish Tribe, Suquamish Tribe, State of Oregon, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, State of Washington, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Squaxin Island Tribe, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation d/b/a Wing Luke Museum, Samish Indian Nation, Nez Perce Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Historic Seattle, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon, Limited, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, HistoryLink, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Hoh Indian Tribe, The Klamath Tribes, Nooksack Indian Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, Museum Of History And Industry, Quinault Indian Nation, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Vought, #3 Summons Ferriero, #4 Summons Bodner, #5 Summons Murphy, #6 Summons NARA, #7 Summons OMB, #8 Summons PBRB, #9 Summons GSA)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases where THE KLAMATH TRIBES is a litigant