This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2023 at 09:27:21 (UTC).

State of Texas et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 State of Texas filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Drew B Tipton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Drew B Tipton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Alabama

State of Alaska

State of Arkansas

State of Florida

State of Idaho

State of Iowa

State of Kansas

Commonwealth of Kentucky

State of Louisiana

State of Mississippi

State of Missouri

State of Montana

State of Nebraska

State of Ohio

State of South Carolina

State of Tennessee

State of Utah

State of West Virginia

State of Wyoming

State of Texas

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr

Christopher Robison

Nicholas J Bronni

James H Percival

David M.S. Dewhirst

Eric H Wessan

Jesse Burris

Marc Manley

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

Justin L Matheny

Charles F. Capps

Joshua Divine

Christian B Corrigan

Eric Hamilton

Benjamin M Flowers

Sylvia May Mailman

Thomas T. Hydrick

Clark Lassiter Hildabrand

Melissa A Holyoak

Leif A. Olson

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

102 #2

Proposed Order

102 #1

Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests

#102

(#102) MOTION for Discovery by State of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests, #2 Proposed Order)(Walters, Ryan) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

101 #1

Exhibit Proposed Discovery Requests

#101

(#101) MOTION for Discovery by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Requests)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#100

(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa Fudim on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Ward on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Ward, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#98

(#98) ORDER granting #91 Motion for James K. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#91

(#98) ORDER granting #91 Motion for James K. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

5 #1

Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 02:00 PM by video before Judge Drew B Tipton.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(BrittanyBoniface, 6) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

1 #2

Continuation Civil Cover Sheet Attachment

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#102) MOTION for Discovery by State of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests, #2 Proposed Order)(Walters, Ryan) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#101) MOTION for Discovery by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Requests)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa Fudim on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Ward on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Ward, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#98) ORDER granting #91 Motion for James K. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#97) ORDER granting #96 Motion for Benjamin Michael Flowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#96) MOTION for Benjamin M. Flowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#95) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD from U.S. Department of Justice by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment, #4 Unredacted attachment, #5 Unredacted attachment, #6 Unredacted attachment, #7 Unredacted attachment)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#94) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD from U.S. Department of Justice by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment, #4 Unredacted attachment, #5 Unredacted attachment, #6 Unredacted attachment, #7 Unredacted attachment)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#93) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD from U.S. Department of Justice by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment, #4 Unredacted attachment, #5 Unredacted attachment, #6 Unredacted attachment, #7 Unredacted attachment, #8 Unredacted attachment)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Joshua M. Divine to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(BrittanyBoniface, 6) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Charles F. Capps to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Missouri, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/22/2023. (Capps, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Joshua M. Divine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Missouri, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/22/2023. (Divine, Joshua) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corrected MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division, Western District of Texas or District of Columbia; Alternatively, to Brownsville, Corpus Christi, Houston, Laredo, or McAllen in the Southern District by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2023. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division, Western District of Texas or District of Columbia; Alternatively, to Brownsville, Corpus Christi, Houston, Laredo, or McAllen in the Southern District by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs & Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, filed. (Reuveni, Erez) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 02:00 PM by video before Judge Drew B Tipton.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(BrittanyBoniface, 6) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29363625) filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Continuation Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Olson, Leif) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened PDF on 1/24/2023) (BrittanyBoniface, 6). (Entered: 01/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less