This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2021 at 09:56:11 (UTC).

State of Texas et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 State of Texas filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Drew B Tipton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Drew B Tipton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Louisiana

State of Texas

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States of America

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Troy Miller

Tracy Renaud

Tae Johnson

Alejandro Mayorkas

Amicus Curiae

FIEL Houston

Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services

Immigration Reform Law Institute

Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Scott StJohn

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

William Thomas Thompson

Patrick K Sweeten

Ryan Daniel Walters

Defendant Attorneys

Brian C Rosen-Shaud

Michael F Knapp

Adam David Kirschner

Kuntal Cholera

Daniel David Hu

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kathryn Lynn Huddleston

Spencer Amdur

Matt A Crapo

Walter Stephen Zimolong, III

 

Court Documents

#53

#52

#51

50 #1

Proposed Order

#50

#49

#47

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

2 #8

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

2 #7

Tracy Renaud, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of the U.S.

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Louisiana_DHS Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C - Texas_DHS Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Feb. 18, 2021 Memo

1 #1

Exhibit A - Jan. 20, 2021 Memo

#1

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #52 Motion for Spencer Amdur to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Spencer Amdur to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FIEL Houston, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2021. (Amdur, Spencer) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of Louisiana, State of Texas. (Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Louisiana, State of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE FIEL HOUSTON AND RAICES re: #44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #47 Order on Motion for Leave to File by FIEL Houston, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, filed.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: #47 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #39 MOTION for Leave to File File a Memorandum of Law as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Immigration Reform Law Institute, filed.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to File; granting #39 Motion for leave to file.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) . (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of JASON CLARK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RE DE #45 , #41 AND #18 , filed.(legarza, 2) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #41 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by FIEL Houston, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Huddleston, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tae Johnson served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Troy Miller served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alejandro Mayorkas served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States of America served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021, filed.(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Troy Miller, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Mayorkas, #2 Summons Issued - US Dept of Homeland Security, #3 Summons Issued - Miller, #4 Summons Issued - US Customs & Border, #5 Summons Issued - Johnson, #6 Summons Issued - US ICE, #7 Summons Issued - Renaud, #8 Summons Issed - US Citizenship & Immigration)(CarrieDickie, 6) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Drew B Tipton(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity, #2 U. S. Department of Homeland Security, #3 Troy Miller, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity, #4 U.S. Customs and Border Protection, #5 Tae Johnson, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in his official capacity, #6 U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, #7 Tracy Renaud, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, in her official capacity, #8 U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26228826) filed by State of Louisiana, State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 20, 2021 Memo, #2 Exhibit B - Feb. 18, 2021 Memo, #3 Exhibit C - Texas_DHS Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Louisiana_DHS Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less