This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 07:48:03 (UTC).

State of Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights v. City of East Providence et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 State of Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of East Providence. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. McConnell, Jr. and Patricia A. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights

Defendants

City of East Providence

Malcolm Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kate Constance Brody

180 Westminster Street, Third Floor

Providence, RI 02903

John C. Bogue, Jr.

Attorney at Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights

180 Westminster Street

Providence, RI 02903

Kate C. Brody

Attorney at Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights

180 Westminster Street, 3Rd Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Removal - State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Bogue, Jr. on behalf of State of Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights (Bogue, John) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by City of East Providence, Malcolm Moore.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 11/21/2022; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/21/2022; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/20/2023; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/21/2023; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/22/2023. Parties may request referral to Court Mediation via email to the Case Manager. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/20/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 11/21/2022; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/21/2022; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/20/2023; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/21/2023; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/22/2023. Parties may request referral to Court Mediation via email to the Case Manager. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/20/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by City of East Providence, Malcolm Moore.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Bogue, Jr. on behalf of State of Rhode Island Commission for Human Rights (Bogue, John) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2022-00736. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1752134, filed by Malcolm Moore, City of East Providence. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2022-00736. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1752134, filed by Malcolm Moore, City of East Providence. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc DeSisto