This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2021 at 07:43:40 (UTC).

State of Oklahoma et al v. USA et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 State of Oklahoma filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Will Rogers Downs, LLC

State of West Virginia

West Virginia Racing Commission

Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission

Tulsa County Public Facilities Authority doing business as Fair Meadows Racing and Sports Bar

Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc.

State of Oklahoma

Global Gaming RP, LLC doing business as Remington Park

Oklahoma Quarter Horse Racing Association

United States Trotting Association

Defendants

Noah Joshua Phillips

Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc.

Christine S. Wilson

Federal Trade Commission

Leonard S. Coleman, Jr.

Rebecca Kelly Slaughter

Nancy M. Cox

Rohit Chopra

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Todd Hembree

Attorney at Cherokee Nation Businesses

777 W. Cherokee Street

Catoosa, OK 74015

Lindsay S. See

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - West Virginia

1900 Kanawha Boulevard E., Building 1, Room E-26

Charleston, WV 25305

Bryan Cleveland

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - State of Oklahoma

313 N.E. 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Mithun Mansinghani

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - State of Oklahoma

313 N.E. 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Randall J. Yates

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - State of Oklahoma

313 N.E. 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Michael Joseph Gartland

Attorney at DelCotto Law Group PLLC

200 N. Upper Street

Lexington, KY 40507

Matthew D. McGill

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - DC

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Lochlan F. Shelfer

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - DC

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N. Broadway Avenue, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jared Collier Easterling

Attorney at Green Law Firm PC

301 E. Main Street

Ada, OK 74820

Joseph H. Bocock

Attorney at Bocock Law PLLC

119 N. Robinson Avenue, Suite 630

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle M. Melloan, AUSA

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

260 W. Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507-1612

David T. Royse

Attorney at Ransdell, Roach and Royse, PLLC

176 Pasadena Drive, Building 1

Lexington, KY 40503

Lide E. Paterno

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

John C. Roach

Attorney at Ransdell, Roach and Royse, PLLC

176 Pasadena Drive, Building 1

Lexington, KY 40503

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#52

51 #3

Proposed Order

51 #2

Attachment Cert of Good Standing

51 #1

Affidavit

#51

50 #3

Proposed Order

50 #2

Attachment Cert of Good Standing

50 #1

Affidavit

#50

1 #8

Summons -Slaughter

1 #7

Summons -Phillips

1 #6

Summons -FTC

1 #5

Summons -Cox

1 #4

Summons -Coleman

1 #3

Summons -Chopra

1 #2

Summons Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Lide E. Paterno & Pratik A. Shah re #50 and #51 MOTIONS for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (MDC) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER: 1) The #50 and #51 Motions for Admission pro hac vice of Lide E. Paterno and Pratik A. Shah are GRANTED; 2) Lide E. Paterno and Pratik A. Shah are ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc., Leonard S. Coleman, Jr., and Nancy M. Cox. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 06/08/2021. (MDC)cc: COR and Lide E. Paterno and Pratik A. Shah by US Mail (Order + Atty Registration Form) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for Pratik A. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leonard S. Coleman, Jr, Nancy M. Cox, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4988496) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Roach, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION for Lide E. Paterno to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leonard S. Coleman, Jr, Nancy M. Cox, Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4988468) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Roach, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties' #45 JOINT MOTION for scheduling order is DENIED IN PART, insofar as the parties request an oral argument on dispositive motions that have yet to be briefed, and GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1) Amend Complaint: 07/15/2021; 2) Dispositive Motions: Dfts 08/16/2021; 3) Dispositive Motions: Plas 09/15/2021; 4) Response/Reply in support of Dispositive Motions: Dfts 10/15/2021; 5) Reply in Support of Dispositive Motions: Plas 11/05/2021; 6) The parties are relieved of any obligation to meet and confer under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f ). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 06/07/2021. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Lide E. Paterno by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Pratik A. Shah by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #45 JOINT MOTION for scheduling order by Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc., United States Trotting Association (MDC) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc.. (Roach, John) (Entered: 06/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JOINT MOTION for scheduling order by Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc., United States Trotting Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelfer, Lochlan) Modified Filers on 6/7/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Michael Burrage to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Global Gaming RP, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958501) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing issued by the Oklahoma Bar Association dated 4/26/2021, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/26/2021, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/Filer on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Matthew D. McGill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc., and the United States Trotting Association ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958479) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing issued by the DC Court of Appeals dated 4/22/2021, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/26/2021, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/Filers on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Mithun Mansinghani to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Quarter Horse Racing Association, Tulsa County Public Facilities Authority ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958453) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing isued by the Court of Appeals of Maryland dated 4/16/21, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/26/21, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/Filers on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Randall Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission, and Tulsa County Public Facilities Authority ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958422) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing issued by the Supreme Court of the State of Oklahoma dated 4/26/21, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/27/21, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/Filers on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Bryan G. Cleveland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission, and Tulsa County Public Facilities Authority ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958371) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing isued by the State of Oklahoma dated 4/23/21, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/27/21, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/Filers on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Lochlan F. Shelfer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc., United States Trotting Association. and United States Trotting Association ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4958320) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing isued by the State of Maryland dated 4/16/21, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form dated 4/26/21, #3 Proposed Order)(Gartland, Michael) Modified Text/ Filers on 4/28/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc.. and United States Trotting Association (Gartland, Michael) Modified filers/text on 5/3/2021 (MDC). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JER) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -Chopra, #2 Summons -Coleman, #3 Summons -Cox, #4 Summons -FTC, #5 Summons -Phillips, #6 Summons Slaughter, #7 Summons -USA, #8 Summons -Wilson)(JER) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4957239), filed by Oklahoma Quarter Horse Racing Association, Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, Will Rogers Downs, LLC, Tulsa County Public Facilities Authority, West Virginia Racing Commission, Global Gaming RP, LLC, Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc., #3 Summons -Chopra, #4 Summons -Coleman, #5 Summons -Cox, #6 Summons -FTC, #7 Summons -Phillips, #8 Summons -Slaughter, #9 Summons -USA, #10 Summons -Wilson)(JER) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle M. Melloan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lide E. Paterno