This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:43:27 (UTC).

State Of Ohio v. Coggins et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 State Of Ohio filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Coggins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Rose. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Ohio

Defendants

U.S. Department of Commerce

U.S. Census Bureau

Ron S. Jarmin

Wynn Coggins

Amicus Curiae

King County, Washington

City o f Salinas

Black Alliance for Just Immigration

City of Chicago

National Urban League

NAACP

Gila River Indian Community

City of San Jose, California

City of Los Angeles

Navajo Nation

League of Women Voters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sylvia May Davis

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

615 W Superior Ave, 11Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Benjamin Michael Flowers

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General's Office

30 E. Broad St.

Columbus, OH 43215

Bridget C Coontz

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General's Office

30 E. Broad St., 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Julie M Pfeiffer

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General's Office

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Jonathan David Blanton

Attorney at Office of the Ohio Attorney General

30 East Broad Street, 17Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Ehrlich

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Nancy A Valentine

Attorney at Miller Canfield

1100 Superior Avenue E Suite 1750

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#32

RESTRICTED

#31

RESTRICTED

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Census Bureau Statement on Redistricting DataTimeline

1 #1

Exhibit Timeline for Releasing Redistricting Data

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Transcript of Proceedings held on March 17, 2021, before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary A. Schweinhagen, Telephone number 937-512-1604/mary_schweinhagen@ohsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 4/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2021. (mas) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Transcript of Proceedings held on March 2, 2021, before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary A. Schweinhagen, Telephone number 937-512-1604/mary_schweinhagen@ohsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 4/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2021. (mas) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) USCA Case Number 21-3294 for #28 Notice of Appeal filed by State Of Ohio; case manager C. Anthony Milton, 513-564-7026. (er) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff State Of Ohio for proceedings held on 3/2/21; 3/17/21 before Judge Thomas Rose.. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #27 Clerk's Judgment, #26 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8233676) by Plaintiff State Of Ohio. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/24/21. (pb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ECF. #6 , DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND TERMINATING CASE. Because Plaintiff lacks standing to bring an action, this Court lacks jurisdiction over the questions presented and need not opine on whether a press release violates the Administrative Procedure Act or the Census Act. Thus, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Mandamus, ECF #6 , is DENIED. The instant action is DISMISSED and the case is TERMINATED on the docket of the United States District Court for the Southern District ofOhio, Western Division at Dayton. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3/24/21. (ep) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Wynn Coggins answer due 5/3/2021; Ron S. Jarmin answer due 5/3/2021; U.S. Census Bureau answer due 5/3/2021; U.S. Department of Commerce answer due 5/3/2021. (jmb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on All Parties on 3/2/21, filed by Plaintiff State Of Ohio. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney c/o Civil Process Clerk, and U.S. Attorney General (jmb) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Wynn Coggins, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce; Ron S. Jarmin, Acting Director of the U.S. Census Bureau; U.S. Census Bureau; and, U.S. Department of Commerce (jmb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Combined Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, and Memorandum in Support of the Combined Motion and Petition served on All Defendants on 2/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff State Of Ohio. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sylvia May Davis as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 02/25/2021. (jmb) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sylvia May Davis by Plaintiff State Of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Flowers, Benjamin) Modified on 2/25/2021 to reflect no filing fee owed pursuant to S.D.L.R. 83.3 (g)(4) (jmb). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State Of Ohio. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8163619), filed by State Of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timeline for Releasing Redistricting Data, #2 Exhibit Census Bureau Statement on Redistricting DataTimeline, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flowers, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Salinas is a litigant

Latest cases where Black Alliance for Just Immigration is a litigant

Latest cases where National Urban League is a litigant