This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:44:28 (UTC).

State of New York v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 State of New York filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of New York

Defendants

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company

The Chemours Company

National Foam Inc

Tyco Fire Products LP

Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.

Amerex Corporation

Fire Service Plus, Inc.

3M Company

Chemguard Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brendan S McGrath

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

Philip M Bein

Attorney at New York State Attorney General's Office

28 Liberty Street, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Matthew J. Sinkman

Attorney at New York State Attorney General - New York Office

28 Liberty Street, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Lisa M. Burianek

Attorney at New York State Department of Law - Albany Office

Defendant Attorneys

Keith Edward Smith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

2700 Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph G Petrosinelli

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP-DC

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Court Plaza South - West Wing, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Thomas John Herten

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

John W Cerreta

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Andrew Jonathan Calica

Attorney at Mayer Brown

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01541. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Letter Request Letter Motion from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 907664-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4971706) filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE as to Attorney Jonathan I. Handler re #4 Notice of Admission Requirement. Attorney Handler does not intend to remain as counsel of record. Attorney John W. Cerreta filed a #7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. {With copy of Notice of Admission Requirement and envelope attached}. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Service with Fire Service Plus, Inc. by State of New York. (McGrath, Brendan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendants; Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 706-865-4400 and Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 12/27/2019. Copies served upon attorneys by regular mail on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

4 #1

Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#9

(#9) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #21. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Service with Fire Service Plus, Inc. by State of New York. (McGrath, Brendan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#12) CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#11) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern New York, 1:19-cv-01541, State of New York v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-00048-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01541. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #21. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE as to Attorney Jonathan I. Handler re #4 Notice of Admission Requirement. Attorney Handler does not intend to remain as counsel of record. Attorney John W. Cerreta filed a #7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. {With copy of Notice of Admission Requirement and envelope attached}. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/23/2019. (tab)[Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter Request Letter Motion from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notes that Assistant Attorney Generals Brendan S. McGrath, Lisa M. Burianek, and Matthew J. Sinkman addresses listed on CM/ECF differ than what is listed on the Certificate of Service from the Notice of Removal. If CM/ECF needs to be updated the attorneys are directed to do so. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • ***Answer due date updated for Tyco Fire Products, LP answer due 12/19/2019 and Chemguard, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendants; Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 706-865-4400 and Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 12/27/2019. Copies served upon attorneys by regular mail on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 907664-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4971706) filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.