This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 07:40:01 (UTC).

State of New York et al v. Wheeler et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 State of New York filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00419

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF CONNECTICUT

Hartford, CT 06141-0120

STATE OF NEW YORK

Defendants

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Administrator Andrew R. Wheeler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morgan Anna Costello

Attorney at Nys Office of Attorney General

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claiborne Ellis Walthall on behalf of State of New York. (Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Nancy Lacedonia on behalf of State of Connecticut. (Lacedonia, Jill) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of January 24, 2020 Order (Doc. No. 9) and Individual Practices of U.S. District Judge Lorna G. Schofield served on Lucas Issacharoff, AUSA, U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY on January 27, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by State of New York. (Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#1

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, and the United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by State of Connecticut, State of New York. (Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, and the United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by State of Connecticut, State of New York. (Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/24/2020) (cf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Morgan Anna Costello to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption; Jury Demand code - no selection; second page of the PDF was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. Document filed by State of New York, State of Connecticut. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, Administrator & U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK. (Costello, Morgan) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (dnh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. Document filed by State of New York, State of Connecticut. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of January 24, 2020 Order (Doc. No. 9) and Individual Practices of U.S. District Judge Lorna G. Schofield served on Lucas Issacharoff, AUSA, U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY on January 27, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by State of New York. (Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/24/2020) (cf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Nancy Lacedonia on behalf of State of Connecticut. (Lacedonia, Jill) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claiborne Ellis Walthall on behalf of State of New York. (Walthall, Claiborne) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (dnh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, and the United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by State of Connecticut, State of New York. (Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Morgan Anna Costello. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: State of New York; State of Connecticut; Andrew R. Wheeler; United States Environmental Protection Agency. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Morgan Anna Costello. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Morgan Anna Costello to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption; Jury Demand code - no selection; second page of the PDF was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costello, Morgan) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, Administrator & U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK. (Costello, Morgan) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-18518596)Document filed by STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT.(Costello, Morgan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.