This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:49:59 (UTC).

State of New York et al v. Wheeler et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 State of New York filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11673

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

District of Columbia

City of New York

State of Maryland

State of Maine

State of Connecticut

State of Illinois

State of Michigan

State of New York

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

State of Vermont

State of Washington

State of Rhode Island

State of New Jersey

State of Oregon

Commonwealth of Virginia

State of California

Defendants

Andrew R. Wheeler

R. D. James

United States Army Corps of Engineers

United States Environmental Protection Agency

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip Michael Bein

Attorney at NYS Office of The Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Brian Caldwell

Attorney at Office of The Attorney General For The District of Columbia

441 Fourth St. Nw, Ste 650-S

Washington, DC 20001

Joshua M Segal

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

200 Saint Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 20012

Jason Elliott James

Attorney at Illinois Office of the Attorney General

69 W. Washington St., 18Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Daniel P Bock

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Monica Blong Wagner

Attorney at Office of The New York Attorney General

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Timothy Hoffman

Attorney at New York State Attorney General's Office

350 Main Street, Suite 300A

Buffalo, NY 14202

Benjamin Daniel Battles

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609

Alison Hoffman

Attorney at Rhode Island Attorney General

150 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02903

Paul Garrahan

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street Ne

Salem, OR 97301

David Grandis

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorney

David Stuart Jones

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY (86 Chambers St.)

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Other Attorneys

Robert William Hamburg

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1001

 

Court Documents

41 #5

Text of Proposed Order Order

41 #4

Supplement Certificate of Good standing (MA)

41 #3

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (DC)

41 #2

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (MD)

41 #1

Affidavit Affidavit

#41

#40

#39

#27

9 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel P. Bock

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Joshua Morris Segal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18809795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION for Joshua Morris Segal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18809795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (MD), #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #4 Supplement Certificate of Good standing (MA), #5 Text of Proposed Order Order).(Segal, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/5/2020. Responses due by 4/2/2020 Replies due by 4/30/2020. (ks) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER denying #27 Motion for Conference. On January 9, 2020, proposed Business Intervenors filed a letter requesting a conference regarding their anticipated motion to intervene pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. The parties responded, stating they did not oppose the motion. The motion for a pre-motion conference is DENIED and the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Motion to Intervene: March 5, 2020; Opposition: April 2, 2020; Reply, if any: April 30, 2020; SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/6/2020) (ks) Modified on 2/12/2020 (ks). (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 3/30/2020. (rj) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, SO ORDERED.,. R. D. James answer due 3/30/2020; United States Army Corps of Engineers answer due 3/30/2020; United States Environmental Protection Agency answer due 3/30/2020; Andrew R. Wheeler answer due 3/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/31/2020) (rj) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or motion with respect to complaint, until March 30, 2020 addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David S. Jones dated January 30, 2020. Document filed by R. D. James, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler.(Jones, David) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Philip Bein dated January 22, 2020 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion to Intervene addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert W. Hamburg dated January 9, 2020. . Document filed by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David S. Jones dated January 22, 2020 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion to Intervene addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert W. Hamburg dated January 9, 2020. . Document filed by R. D. James, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Jones, David) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Alison Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/21/2020) (rj) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Daniel P. Bock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335618. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Daniel P. Bock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335618. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by STATE OF MICHIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel P. Bock, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bock, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Daniel Battles on behalf of STATE OF VERMONT. (Battles, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, State of California, State of Maine, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, State of California, State of Maine, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) Modified on 12/23/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R.D. James, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, State of California, State of Maine, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United State Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, State of California, State of Maine, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, State of California, State of Maine, State of Washington. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew R. Wheeler, United States Environmental Protection Agency, R. D. James, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18330167)Document filed by STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF MICHIGAN, State of California, STATE OF NEW YORK, CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF OREGON, State of Washington, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, State of Maine.(Bein, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert William Hamburg