This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2021 at 09:12:43 (UTC).

State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David I Zalman

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Gwen Farley

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 093

Trenton, NJ 08625

Scott E Kauff

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Dema PC

One Central Plaza, 11300 Rockville Pike, Suite 112

Rockville, MD 20852

William J Jackson

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Martin A Krolewski

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Christina N Stripp

Attorney at Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann and Knopf LLP

250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

John K Dema

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Dema PC

1236 Strand Street, Suite 103

Christiansted St Croix, VI 00823

Leonard Z Kaufmann

Attorney at Cohn Baughman and Martin

333 W Wacker Drive, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

David M Reap

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Cane

Attorney at US Department of Justice (Environmental)

Po Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#1140

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection. United States of America served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. Filing corrected for event type as to USA-Complaint served (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Cane on behalf of Department of Defense, Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, United States of America, United States of America, United States of America, United States, United States Air Force Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02115-RMG, 2:20-cv-02899-RMG, 2:21-cv-00146-RMG(Cane, John) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection v. USA, as DSC case 2:21-cv-146-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Jersey (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9589144.), filed by State of New Jersey, Department of Environmental Protection. Service due by 4/14/2021(sshe, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John K Dema

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gwen Farley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J Jackson