This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:23:15 (UTC).

State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood v. Credit Acceptance Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 State of Mississippi ex rel Jim Hood filed an Other lawsuit against Credit Acceptance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood

Defendant

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blake Anthony Tyler

Attorney at STOVER, GADOW & TYLER PLLC

511 East Pearl Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Jacqueline H. Ray-State Gov

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

550 High Street, Suite 1200, P. O. Box 220 (39205)

Jackson, MS 39201

Jason M. Kirschberg

Attorney at GADOW TYLER, PLLC

511 East Pearl Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Elizabeth Paige Boggs - PHV

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE, LLC - Washington

401 9Th St. Nw, Suite 1001

Washington, DC 20004

Mimi Liu - PHV

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE, LLC - Washington

401 9Th St. Nw, Suite 1001

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorneys

R. David Kaufman

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Darren M. Welch - PHV

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLP - D.C.

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Martin Patrick McDowell

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Anand S. Raman - PHV

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLP - D.C.

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jonathan Frank - PHV

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLC - New York

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Patrick G. Rideout - PHV

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLC - New York

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Cody C. Bailey

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Attachment Memorandum Brief

#14

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Briefing Schedule Order

#13

#12

#11

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - VA Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing

#3

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court File

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Briefing Schedule Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 6/25/2019 (nd) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/21/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Fees filed by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Liu - PHV, Mimi) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Fees by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum Brief)(Liu - PHV, Mimi) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (KNS) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Briefing Schedule Order)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MS Retail Installment Contract)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Elizabeth Paige Boggs and Mimi Liu are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/24/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Elizabeth Paige Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Mississippi ex rel. Jim Hood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - IN Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Kirschberg, Jason) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Anand S. Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Darren M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Jonathan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anand S. Raman, Darren M. Welch, Jonathan Frank, and Patrick G. Rideout are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/22/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (Bailey, Cody) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Patrick McDowell on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (McDowell, Martin) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995336) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Jonathan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995327) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - MA Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Darren M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3995321) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - VA Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Anand S. Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Anand S. Raman receipt number 0538-3995301 $ 100 (Kaufman, R.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Credit Acceptance Corporation from Chancery Court of the First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CH1:19-cv-515. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3994677) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick George Rideout

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Patrick McDowell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cody C. Bailey