This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 11:47:17 (UTC).

State of Louisiana et al v. Biden et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 State of Louisiana filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Biden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01074

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Florida

State of Alabama

State of South Dakota

Defendants

Deb Haaland

Kei Koizumi

Brenda Mallory

Michael S. Regan

Shalanda Young

Gina McCarthy

Gina Raimondo

Xavier Becerra

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

National Highway Traffic Safety Administration

Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases

Joseph R Biden, Jr

U.S. Department of Transportation

U.S. Department of Agriculture

Jack Danielson

Cecilia Rouse

Tom Vilsack

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

Attorney at LA Atty Generals Office (94005)

P O Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Rachel Rose Siegel

Attorney at Attorney General of FL

1515 N Flagler Dr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Joseph Scott St John

Attorney at LA Dept of Justice (1850)

909 Poydras St Ste 1850

New Orleans, LA 70112

Benjamin William Wallace

Attorney at LA Dept of Justice (N 3rd St)

1885 N 3Rd St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Edmund G LaCour, Jr

Attorney at Attorney General of AL

501 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36130

Katie J Hruska

Attorney at State of South Dakota

500 E Capitol Ave

Pierre, SD 57501

Defendant Attorneys

Cody Taylor Knapp

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St/12004)

1100 L St Rm 12004

Washington, DC 20005

Stephen Michael Pezzi

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St/10044)

1100 L St Nw Ste 10044

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Lindsay S See

Attorney at Attorney General of WV

1900 Kanawha Blvd E Bldg 1 Rm 26E

Charleston, WV 25305

Andrew A Pinson

Attorney at Attorney General of GA

40 Capitol Square S W

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

Justin L Matheny

Attorney at Attorney General of MS

550 High St Ste 1200

Jackson, MS 39201

Tyler R Green

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy

222 S Main St 5Th Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Travis Steven Jordan

Attorney at Attorney General of WY

109 State Capitol

Cheyenne, WY 82009

Daniel Joseph Shapiro

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy

222 S Main St 5Th Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

James C Kaste

Attorney at Attorney General of WY

109 State Capitol

Cheyenne, WY 82009

 

Court Documents

27 #2

Proposed order

27 #1

Certificate of good standing

#27

(#27) MOTION for Eric Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4709502) by State of Texas. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew A Pinson for State of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

25 #2

Proposed order

25 #1

Certificate of good standing

#25

(#25) MOTION for Andrew Pinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4692801) by State of Georgia. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Main Document 25 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Jones, P). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Jones, P). Modified on 6/2/2021 to indicate replaced docs in proper pdf format (Jones, P). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Rachel Siegel for State of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/1/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

15 #1

Certificate of good standing

6 #1

Certificate of good standing

#6

(#6) MOTION for Daniel Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4656127) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

5 #1

Certificate of good standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Tyler R. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4656101) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Taylor Knapp on behalf of U S Dept of Agriculture, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Pete Buttigieg, Jack Danielson, Brian Deese, U S Dept of Energy, U S Environmental Protection Agency, Jennifer Granholm, Deb Haaland, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases, U S Dept of Interior, Kei Koizumi, Brenda Mallory, Gina McCarthy, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Gina Raimondo, Michael S Regan, Cecilia Rouse, U S Dept of Transportation, Tom Vilsack, Janet Yellen, Shalanda Young (Attorney Cody Taylor Knapp added to all Defendants) (aty,Knapp, Cody) Modified on 4/27/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Pezzi on behalf of U S Dept of Agriculture, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Pete Buttigieg, Jack Danielson, Brian Deese, U S Dept of Energy, U S Environmental Protection Agency, Jennifer Granholm, Deb Haaland, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases, U S Dept of Interior, Kei Koizumi, Brenda Mallory, Gina McCarthy, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Gina Raimondo, Michael S Regan, Cecilia Rouse, U S Dept of Transportation, Tom Vilsack, Janet Yellen, Shalanda Young (Attorney Stephen Michael Pezzi added to all Defendants) (aty,Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 4/27/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cecilia Rouse, Shalanda Young, Kei Koizumi, Janet Yellen, Deb Haaland, Tom Vilsack, Gina Raimondo, Xavier Becerra, Pete Buttigieg, Jennifer Granholm, Brenda Mallory, Michael S Regan, Gina McCarthy, Brian Deese, Jack Danielson, U S Environmental Protection Agency, U S Department of Energy, U S Department of Transportation, U S Department of Agriculture, U S Department of the Interior, National Highway Traffic Safey Administration, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost f Greenhouse Gases. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph R Biden Jr, Cecilia Rouse, Shalanda Young, Kei Koizumi, Janet Yellen, Deb Haaland, Tom Vilsack, Gina Raimondo, Xavier Becerra, Pete Buttigieg, Jennifer Granholm, Brenda Mallory, Michael S Regan, Gina McCarthy, Brian Deese, Jack Danielson, U S Environmental Protection Agency, U S Dept of Energy, U S Dept of Transportation, U S Dept of Agriculture, U S Dept of Interior, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4649411) filed by State of South Dakota, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Wyoming, State of Mississippi, State of Florida, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Georgia, Kentucky Commonwealth of. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alabama, Kentucky Commonwealth, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, South Dakota, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Eric Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4709502) by State of Texas. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew A Pinson for State of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Andrew Pinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4692801) by State of Georgia. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Main Document 25 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Jones, P). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/2/2021) (Jones, P). Modified on 6/2/2021 to indicate replaced docs in proper pdf format (Jones, P). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Rachel Siegel for State of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/1/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Travis S Jordan for State of Wyoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/28/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James C Kaste for State of Wyoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/28/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Justin L Matheny for State of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/28/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lindsay S See for State of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/28/2021. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Travis Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4688292) by State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for James Kaste to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4688224) by State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Benjamin Wallace to Enroll as Counsel by State of Alabama, State of Florida, State of Georgia, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Katie J. Hruska to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4658368) by State of South Dakota. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4657082) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Daniel Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4656127) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Tyler R. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4656101) by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Taylor Knapp on behalf of U S Dept of Agriculture, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Pete Buttigieg, Jack Danielson, Brian Deese, U S Dept of Energy, U S Environmental Protection Agency, Jennifer Granholm, Deb Haaland, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases, U S Dept of Interior, Kei Koizumi, Brenda Mallory, Gina McCarthy, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Gina Raimondo, Michael S Regan, Cecilia Rouse, U S Dept of Transportation, Tom Vilsack, Janet Yellen, Shalanda Young (Attorney Cody Taylor Knapp added to all Defendants) (aty,Knapp, Cody) Modified on 4/27/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Pezzi on behalf of U S Dept of Agriculture, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Pete Buttigieg, Jack Danielson, Brian Deese, U S Dept of Energy, U S Environmental Protection Agency, Jennifer Granholm, Deb Haaland, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases, U S Dept of Interior, Kei Koizumi, Brenda Mallory, Gina McCarthy, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Gina Raimondo, Michael S Regan, Cecilia Rouse, U S Dept of Transportation, Tom Vilsack, Janet Yellen, Shalanda Young (Attorney Stephen Michael Pezzi added to all Defendants) (aty,Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 4/27/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Cecilia Rouse, Shalanda Young, Kei Koizumi, Janet Yellen, Deb Haaland, Tom Vilsack, Gina Raimondo, Xavier Becerra, Pete Buttigieg, Jennifer Granholm, Brenda Mallory, Michael S Regan, Gina McCarthy, Brian Deese, Jack Danielson, U S Environmental Protection Agency, U S Department of Energy, U S Department of Transportation, U S Department of Agriculture, U S Department of the Interior, National Highway Traffic Safey Administration, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost f Greenhouse Gases. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph R Biden Jr, Cecilia Rouse, Shalanda Young, Kei Koizumi, Janet Yellen, Deb Haaland, Tom Vilsack, Gina Raimondo, Xavier Becerra, Pete Buttigieg, Jennifer Granholm, Brenda Mallory, Michael S Regan, Gina McCarthy, Brian Deese, Jack Danielson, U S Environmental Protection Agency, U S Dept of Energy, U S Dept of Transportation, U S Dept of Agriculture, U S Dept of Interior, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Interagency Working Group on Social Cost of Greenhouse Gases (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4649411) filed by State of South Dakota, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Wyoming, State of Mississippi, State of Florida, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Georgia, Kentucky Commonwealth of. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alabama, Kentucky Commonwealth, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, South Dakota, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where National Highway Traffic Safety Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant