Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 09:30:59 (UTC).

State of Delaware v. B.P. America Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 State of Delaware filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against B P America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01429

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Delaware

Defendants

Phillips 66 Company

Chevron Corporation

XTO Energy Inc.

Devon Energy Corporation

Total S.A.

Occidental Petroleum Corporation

Royal Dutch Shell PLC

BP p.l.c.

Phillips 66

Marathon Petroleum Corporation

ConocoPhillips Company

Hess Corporation

Shell Oil Company

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

B.P. America Inc.

Consol Energy Inc.

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

Murphy Oil Corporation

Citgo Petroleum Corporation

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ralph K. Durstein, III

Attorney at Department of Justice

Carvel State Office Building, 820 North French Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jameson A.L. Tweedie

Attorney at Delaware Department of Justice

391 Lukens Drive

New Castle, DE 19720

Christian Douglas Wright

Attorney at Department of Justice

820 N. French Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel J. Brown

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael P. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

David E. Wilks

Attorney at Wilks Law, LLC

4250 Lancaster Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19805

Daniel Alan Mason

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200, P.O. Box 32

Wilmington, DE 19899-0032

Matthew D. Stachel

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200, P.O. Box 32

Wilmington, DE 19899-0032

Christian J. Singewald

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-3722

Jeffrey L. Moyer

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christine Dealy Haynes

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

David C. Frederick

Catherine A. Gaul

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Paul Damon Brown

Attorney at Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP

1313 N. Market Street, Suite 5400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Other Attorneys

Kristen Healey Cramer

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael A. Barlow

Attorney at Abrams & Bayliss LLP

20 Montchanin Road, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19807

Nicholas T. Verna

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin J. Mangan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Colleen D. Shields

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

222 Delaware Avenue, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

51 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#88

(#88) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick W. Mizell, Matthew R. Stammel, Stephanie L. Noble, Brooke A. Noble and Mortimer H. Hartwell - filed by Apache Corporation. (Whetzel, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#87

(#87) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna G. Rotman - filed by Total S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Whetzel, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#86

(#86) MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by State of Delaware. (Wright, Christian) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#85

(#85) Joint STATEMENT of Pending Matters Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corporation, B.P. America Inc., BP p.l.c., CNX Resources Corporation, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Consol Energy Inc., Devon Energy Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy USA Inc., Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Ovintiv, Inc., Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Speedway LLC, Total S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc., XTO Energy Inc.. (Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Damon Brown on behalf of CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#5

(#5) JOINDER by CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc., joining in #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder in and Consent to Removal of CNX and CONSOL. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Gaul on behalf of B.P. America Inc., BP p.l.c. (Gaul, Catherine) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Joshua D. Dick re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Certificate of Filing

1 #6

Exhibit 70-75

1 #5

Exhibit 60-69

1 #4

Exhibit 51-59

1 #3

Exhibit 31-50

1 #2

Exhibit 11-30

1 #1

Exhibit 1-10

#1

(#7) JOINDER by Devon Energy Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Singewald, Christian) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick W. Mizell, Matthew R. Stammel, Stephanie L. Noble, Brooke A. Noble and Mortimer H. Hartwell filed by Apache Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/17/20. (ntl) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick W. Mizell, Matthew R. Stammel, Stephanie L. Noble, Brooke A. Noble and Mortimer H. Hartwell - filed by Apache Corporation. (Whetzel, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Anna G. Rotman for Total Specialties USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna G. Rotman filed by Total S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/1/20. (ntl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna G. Rotman - filed by Total S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Whetzel, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by State of Delaware. (Wright, Christian) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Anna Marie Mortimer for Marathon Petroleum Company LP and Marathon Petroleum Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Shawn P. Regan for Marathon Petroleum Company LP, for Marathon Petroleum Corporation, for Speedway LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Shannon S. Broome for Marathon Petroleum Company LP, for Marathon Petroleum Corporation, for Speedway LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Joint STATEMENT of Pending Matters Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corporation, B.P. America Inc., BP p.l.c., CNX Resources Corporation, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Consol Energy Inc., Devon Energy Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy USA Inc., Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Ovintiv, Inc., Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Speedway LLC, Total S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc., XTO Energy Inc.. (Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. - filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Stachel on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy Inc. (Stachel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alan Mason on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy Inc. (Mason, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINDER by Devon Energy Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Singewald, Christian) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Damon Brown on behalf of CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINDER by CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc., joining in #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder in and Consent to Removal of CNX and CONSOL. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Gaul on behalf of B.P. America Inc., BP p.l.c. (Gaul, Catherine) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Joshua D. Dick re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N20C-09-097 AML (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3287691)- filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-30, #3 Exhibit 31-50, #4 Exhibit 51-59, #5 Exhibit 60-69, #6 Exhibit 70-75, #7 Certificate of Filing, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen D. Shields

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Mangan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Healey Cramer