This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2021 at 09:32:03 (UTC).

State of California et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 State of California filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04975

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

District of Columbia

Washington, DC 20001

State of Maine

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

State of Oregon

State of California

Petitioners

Community Healthcare Network

Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration

Center for Public Representation

America's Essential Hospitals

National Center for Law and Economic Justice

Defendants

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan

Amicus Curiae

GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD)

Japanese American Citizens League (JACL)

Women Lawyers on Guard Inc.

EMBARC

Population Connection

Anti-Defamation League

128 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alacoque Hinga Nevitt

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia

400 6Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Valerie Maria Nannery

2208 Good Hope Road Se

Washington, DC 20020

Susan P. Herman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Aimee Diane Thomson

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

1600 Arch St., Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Anna Margaret Rich

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay St., Suite 2000

Oakland, CA 94612-1499

Petitioner Attorneys

Justin Jonathan Lowe

Attorney at healthlawadvocates

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Kelly M. Dermody

Attorney at Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Emily Joanne Nash

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2600

Sean Michael Marotta

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Michael Kolsky

Attorney at Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Russell Laurence Hirschhorn

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Denny W Chan

Attorney at Justice in Aging

3660 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 718

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Owen Masters

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave N.W., Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20004

Frances Cheston Thacher

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christopher Cadena

515 S. Flower St., 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser et al

275 Battery St Fl 29

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Regan M Bailey

Attorney at Justice In Aging

1114 I St. Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Christian Springer

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

1717 K St Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Edward Todd Waters

Attorney at Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell, LLP

1129 20Th Street N.W., Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20036

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#195

#194

#193

#192

191 #2

Exhibit B - DHS Statement re 2019 Public-Charge Rule

191 #1

Exhibit A - DHS Statement re Public-Charge Litigation

#191

#190

#129

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

303 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Adam R. Teitelbaum (Teitelbaum, Adam) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) ORDER staying cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/26/2021. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#193) MANDATE of USCA: Issued pursuant to FRAP Rule 41(a), as to #129 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. USCA No. 19-17214(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) ORDER of USCA as to (124 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, (129 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH) Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) NOTICE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kevin McAleenan, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security of Appeal Dismissal and DHS Statements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DHS Statement re Public-Charge Litigation, #2 Exhibit B - DHS Statement re 2019 Public-Charge Rule)(Lynch, Jason) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) STATUS REPORT by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) NOTICE Regarding Executive Order by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 2/3/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#188) ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #186 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) ORDER of USCA: That appellant's motion to stay mandate is granted. The mandate is stayed pending the Supreme Court's final disposition of Wolf v. Cook County, Illinois, petition for cert. pending, No. 20-450 (filed Oct. 7, 2020) and Department of Homeland Security v. New York, petition for cert. pending, No. 20-449 (filed Oct. 7, 2020). Fed. R. App.P.41., as to (124 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, (129 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH) Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#186) MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Susan P. Herman as Attorney, filed by State of Maine. Responses due by 1/5/2021. Replies due by 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Susan) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Maria Nannery (Nannery, Valerie) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by State of California . (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13617881.). Filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMBARC is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Healthcare Network is a litigant

Latest cases where ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE is a litigant