This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 16:07:13 (UTC).

State of California et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 a Other case was filed by State of California against Trump in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00872

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Elizabeth D. Laporte

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Minnesota

State of Maryland

State of Connecticut

State of New Mexico

Attorney General Dana Nessel

State of Nevada

State of Oregon

Commonwealth of Virginia

State of Colorado

State of Illinois

State of Hawaii

State of Delaware

Defendants

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Steven T. Mnuchin

United States of America

U.S. Department of Defense

Mark T. Esper

Richard V. Spencer

Kirstjen M. Nielsen

Heather Wilson

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee Isaac Sherman

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Jacob Daniel Campion

Attorney at Office of Minnesota Attorney General

445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100

Saint Paul, MN 55101

James F. Zahradka, II

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, Suite 2000

Oakland, CA 94612

Jeffrey Paul Dunlap

Attorney at Maryland Office of the Attorney General

200 Saint Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Tania Maestas

Attorney at NM Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Drawer 1508

Santa Fe, NM 87504-1508

Matthew L. Garcia

Attorney at Governor's General Counsel

P.O. Drawer 1508

Santa Fe, NM 87504-1508

Heidi Parry Stern

Attorney at Solicitor General

100 North Carson Street

Carson City, NE 89701-4717

Jeanne Nicole DeFever

Attorney at Oregon Dept of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Michelle S. Kallen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Eric Reuel Olson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Denver, CO 80203

Caleb Andrew Rush

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

100 W Randolph St, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Clyde James Wadsworth

Attorney at Dept. of the Attorney General

425 Queen Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

David Jay Lyons

Attorney at Delaware Department of Justice

820 N. French St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

Other Attorneys

Matthew Coangelo

Attorney at Chief Counsel fro Federal Initaiatives

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Jeremy Feigenbaum

Attorney at Assistant Attorney General

25 Market Street

Trenton, CA 08625

Gavin Geraghty McCabe

Attorney at Attorney General of the State of CA

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-3664

Michael Phillip Cayaban

Attorney at Ofc Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Colangelo

Attorney at Chief Counsel for Federal Initiatives

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Susan P. Herman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Janelle M. Smith

Attorney at California State Attorney General's Office

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Hawaii, D ana Nessel, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of California, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado Attorney Lee Isaac Sherman does not represent all plaintiffs just the State of California Only. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#8) ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #4 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/19/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#6

#Electronic filing error. The #48 Proposed Summons will not be issued as to the same Defendants listed on the summons issued at docket number #6 , unless those summons' are returned unexecuted. Also, the Clerk's Office will issue a maximum of 3 summons'. Either list all defendants on three summons' or list any additional defendants as an attachment to the proposed summons. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102243.) filed by State of Maine. (Herman, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #4 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

57 #4

Proposed Order

57 #3

Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction

57 #2

Declaration of Lee Sherman

57 #1

Proposed Order

57 #8

Certificate/Proof of Service

57 #7

Request for Judicial Notice

57 #6

Appendix of Declarations re: Environmental

57 #5

Appendix of Declarations re: TFF

#57

(#57) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To enlarge page limits in support of motion for injunctive relief filed by State of California. Responses due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Lee Sherman, #3 Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Appendix of Declarations re: TFF, #6 Appendix of Declarations re: Environmental, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To enlarge page limits in support of motion for injunctive relief filed by State of California. Responses due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Lee Sherman, #3 Notice of Motion & Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Appendix of Declarations re: TFF, #6 Appendix of Declarations re: Environmental, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13233071.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Abigail) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Battles, Benjamin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) AFFIDAVIT by State of California. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13182042.) filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Battles, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/19/2019) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sullivan, Justin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Johnson-Karp, Gabe. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13174333.) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Good Standing)(Sullivan, Justin) (Filed on 3/15/2019) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. The #48 Proposed Summons will not be issued as to the same Defendants listed on the summons issued at docket number #6 , unless those summons' are returned unexecuted. Also, the Clerk's Office will issue a maximum of 3 summons'. Either list all defendants on three summons' or list any additional defendants as an attachment to the proposed summons. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13170489.) filed by State of Wisconsin. (Johnson-Karp, Gabe) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #4 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13102243.) filed by State of Maine. (Herman, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, David Bernhardt, Mark T. Esper, Steven T. Mnuchin, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Heather Wilson, U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney's Office. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/19/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13101792.) filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Maestas, Tania) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Hawaii, D ana Nessel, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of California, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado Attorney Lee Isaac Sherman does not represent all plaintiffs just the State of California Only. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Hawaii, D ana Nessel, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of California, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado Not a Civil Miscellaneous Case (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13100729.). Filed byState of New York, State of Minnesota, State of Colorado, State of California, Dana Nessel, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of New Jersey, State of Delaware, State of Nevada, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.