This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 07:02:54 (UTC).

State of California et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 State of California filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06761

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Blackwell

Bryan Muehlberger

Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

State of California

Defendants

U.S. Department of Justice

Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives

Acting Deputy Direct Regina Lombardo

Attorney General William P. Barr

Chief, Firearms Tech Michael R Curtis

Michael R Curtis

Regina Lombardo

William P. Barr

United States Department of Justice

Intervenors

Zachary Fort

Frederick Barton

BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc.

Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kaylie L Springer

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP

200 Park Avenue, Floor 47

New York, NY 10166

Liesel Schapira

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Lee Crain

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue 47

New York, NY 10166

Vivek R Gopalan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Avi Weitzman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Hannah Elizabeth Shearer

Attorney at Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

268 Bush Street #555

San Francisco, CA 94104

John Adam Skaggs

Attorney at Giffords Law Center

223 West 38Th Street, Box 90

New York, NY 10018

R. Matthew Wise

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Intervenor Attorney

George M. Lee

Attorney at Seiler Epstein LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. (Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

24 #7

Proposed Order

24 #6

Proposed Answer

24 #5

Declaration of Brandon Combs

24 #4

Declaration of Tilden Smith

24 #3

Declaration of Frederick Barton

24 #2

Declaration of Zachary Fort

24 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#24

(#24) MOTION to Intervene filed by Zachary Fort, Frederick Barton, BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Zachary Fort, #3 Declaration of Frederick Barton, #4 Declaration of Tilden Smith, #5 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #6 Proposed Answer, #7 Proposed Order)(Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION FOR HEARING: Motion Hearing re: #24 MOTION to Intervene set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing deadlines remain unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. (Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc. (Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Intervene filed by Zachary Fort, Frederick Barton, BlackHawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Zachary Fort, #3 Declaration of Frederick Barton, #4 Declaration of Tilden Smith, #5 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #6 Proposed Answer, #7 Proposed Order)(Lee, George) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 09:30 AM by Videoconference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Matthew Wise (Wise, R.) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Liesel Schapira) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999476.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schapira, Liesel) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Kaylie Springer) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999435.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Springer, Kaylie) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Lee Crain) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999178.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crain, Lee) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Avi Weitzman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999062.) filed by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weitzman, Avi) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger (Other than the named parties, there is no such interest to report.) (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Frank Blackwell, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Bryan Muehlberger (Giffords Law Center has no parent corporation or publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock.) (Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14998646.). Filed byFrank Blackwell, Bryan Muehlberger, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(Gopalan, Vivek) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence is a litigant

Latest cases where Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant