This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2020 at 16:32:50 (UTC).

State of California et al v. Wheeler et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 State of California filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04869

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

state of north carolina

state of minnesota

state of maryland

state of washington

state of new mexico

state of vermont

state of nevada

state of oregon

commonwealth of virginia

state of colorado

state of illinois

commonwealth of massachusetts

State of wisconsin

district of columbia

state of michigan

state of rhode island

state of connecticut

state of maine

state of new york

Defendant

andrew r. wheeler

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M. Lusignan

Kelly T Wood

Cindy Chang

Heidi Parry Stern

Paul Andrew Garrahan

Carrie Noteboom

Matthew Ireland

Gabe Johnson-Karp

Jillian Renee O'Brien

Other Attorneys

Tatiana Koleva Gaur

Joseph Scott St. John

Charles R Sensiba

David Jonathan Hacker

Catherine Mitchell Wieman

Bradley A. Benbrook

Adam Leonard Levitan

James Kaste

Bryant B. Cannon

Sean T H Dutton

42 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#128

#126

#125

#124

#123

120 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#120

#37

RESTRICTED

#36

#7

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

4 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Gillian E. Wener. Counsel is encouraged to carefully read the Court's Order and the Local Rules before filing another application. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) Transcript of AT&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 10-22-2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (90 in 3:20-cv-04636-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15111683.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/26/2020 filed by State of Michigan. (Wener, Gillian) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Gillian E. Wener. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15111683.) filed by State of Michigan. (Wener, Gillian) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by William G. Grantham. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/22/2020. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#121) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/22/2020. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, and Idaho Rivers United: Andrew Hawley / Sangye Ince-Johnson.Attorneys for Plaintiff State of California: Adam Levitan / Tatiana Gaur.Attorneys for Plaintiff States: Washington (Kelly Wood / Cindy Chang), New York (Brian Lusignan), Colorado (Annette Quill / Carrie Noteboom), Connecticut (Jill Lacedonia), Illinois (Jason James), Maine (Jillian OBrien), Maryland (Stephen Goldstein for John Howard), Massachusetts (Matthew Ireland), Michigan (Jill Wenner), Minnesota (Peter Surdo), Nevada (Heidi Stern), New Jersey (Lisa Morelli), New Mexico (Phil Grantham), North Carolina (Taylor Crabtree), Oregon (Paul Garrahan), Rhode Island (Alison Hoffman), Vermont (Laura Murphy), Virginia (David Grandis), Wisconsin (Gabe Johnson-Karp), and the District of Columbia (Brian Caldwell).Attorneys for Plaintiffs Suquamish Tribe, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Columbia Riverkeeper, and Sierra Club: Kristen Boyles / Moneen Nasmith.Attorneys for Defendants Andrew Wheeler and EPA: Leslie Hill / Vanessa Waldref.Attorney for Intervenors America Petroleum Institute and Interstate Natural Gas Association of America: George Sibley.Attorneys for Intervenor States: Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Texas (Shawn Cowles), West Virginia, Wyoming, and Montana : Joseph St. John / Steven Duvernay. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Bill Grantham ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15095214.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/21/2020 filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grantham, William) (Filed on 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by William G. Grantham. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kelly T. Wood.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mitchell Wieman (Wieman, Catherine) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Cindy Chiang ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14717111.) filed by state of washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chang, Cindy) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Kelly T. Wood ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14717006.) filed by state of washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wood, Kelly) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14715838.). Filed bystate of california. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less