This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:30:51 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is H. Russel Holland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. Russel Holland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ralph V. Ertz, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Ralph Ertz

800 East Dimond Blvd., Suite 3-520

Anchorage, AK 99515

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on William Barr, Attorney General on 2/27/19, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bryan Schroder, U.S. Attorney on 2/26/19, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Service of Order RE Motion to Dismiss by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

3 #1

Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General

#3

(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015453), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on William Barr, Attorney General on 2/27/19, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bryan Schroder, U.S. Attorney on 2/26/19, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Service of Order RE Motion to Dismiss by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Ertz, Ralph) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015453), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less