This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 04:08:29 (UTC).

State Farm Insurance Company v. QVC Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 State Farm Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against QVC Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary K. Dimke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03201

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary K. Dimke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Insurance Company

Defendants

QVC Inc

IC Marks Inc

Pick Five Imports Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A Evezich

Attorney at Evezich Law Offices PLLC

22525 Se 64Th Place, Suite 2300

Issaquah, WA 98027

Defendant Attorneys

Claire Whittal

Attorney at Gillaspy Rhode Faddis & Benn LLC

4380 S Macadam Avenue, Suite 590

Portland, OR 97239

Brittany R Torrence

Attorney at Gillaspy Rhode Faddis & Benn LLC

821 Kirkland Avenue, Suite 200

Kirkland, WA 98033

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 12/16/2022 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Intent to Move for Entry of Default by State Farm Insurance Company (Evezich, Craig) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Insurance Company. (Evezich, Craig) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Betsy A Gillaspy on behalf of Defendant Pick Five Imports Inc (Gillaspy, Betsy) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Vincent LaMonaca) by IC Marks Inc, QVC Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by IC Marks Inc, QVC Inc.(Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Pick Five Imports Inc.(Attorney Claire Whittal added to party Pick Five Imports Inc(pty:dft))(Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#11

(#11) Clerk's Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 1/30/2023. (LAS, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#13

(#13) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IC Marks Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#14

(#14) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pick Five Imports Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#15

(#15) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QVC Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#16

(#16) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IC Marks Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#17

(#17) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pick Five Imports Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#18

(#18) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QVC Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QVC Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pick Five Imports Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IC Marks Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QVC Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pick Five Imports Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IC Marks Inc. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerk's Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 1/30/2023. (LAS, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Pick Five Imports Inc.(Attorney Claire Whittal added to party Pick Five Imports Inc(pty:dft))(Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by IC Marks Inc, QVC Inc.(Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vincent LaMonaca terminated. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (HF) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Vincent LaMonaca) by IC Marks Inc, QVC Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (Whittal, Claire) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Betsy A Gillaspy on behalf of Defendant Pick Five Imports Inc (Gillaspy, Betsy) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Insurance Company. (Evezich, Craig) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Civil Rule 7.1(a)(2), Parties or Intervenors in a diversity case must file a DIVERSITY Disclosure Statement using the event Disclosure Statement - Diversity Cases Only. TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Intent to Move for Entry of Default by State Farm Insurance Company (Evezich, Craig) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 12/16/2022 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4178353 Filed by PICK FIVE IMPORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillaspy, Betsy) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less