This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 05:07:22 (UTC).

State Farm Insurance Company v. Hass et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 State Farm Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hass. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02704

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Insurance Company

Defendants

Marian Hass

Carmi, IL 62821

Sandy Bourrt

Clinton, IA 52732

Vicki Mandurano

Grayslake, IL 60030

Brenda Voss

Rock Falls, IL 61071

Joanie Oliver

Carmi, IL 62821

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather D. Erickson

Attorney at Sanchez Daniels & Hoffman, LLP

333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60606

Meghan Domenica Childers

Attorney at Sanchez Daniels & Hoffman, LLP

333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-2704-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 12/9/2022 (bmc) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

22 #1

*Restricted*

22 #22

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#21

(#21) ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/18/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). 2. The $12,595.64 that Plaintiff paid into this Court's Registry Account, plus interest accrued, shall be disbursed to the Clerk of the United States District Court of the Southern District of Illinois upon entry of this Order. 3. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue payment by check payable to the Clerk of the District Court and mailed to 750 Missouri Ave., East St. Louis, IL 62201. See full written Order. (JS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Oliver to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Haas to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Mandurano to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Brenda Voss. (JS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#10

TEXT ORDER: The docket in this case reflects that each of the Defendants waived service of summons in this case, and their answers or other responsive pleadings were due by 8/16/2022. None of the Defendants has filed an answer. The Court sua sponte extends the Defendants' answer deadline to 10/17/2022. Failure to answer will result in default judgment being entered against the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to send this Text Order to the Defendants at the addresses listed in their executed Waivers of Service, #10 through #14 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/3/2022. (KZ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/03/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit H - Brenda's 1-25-22 Corr

1 #8

Exhibit G - Brenda 12-27-21 Corr

1 #7

Exhibit F - Marian Claim Form

1 #6

Exhibit E - Death Certificate

1 #5

Exhibit D - Obituary

1 #4

Exhibit C - Judgment

1 #3

Exhibit B - Application

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-2704-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 12/9/2022 (bmc) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 1:22-cv-01193. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/18/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). 2. The $12,595.64 that Plaintiff paid into this Court's Registry Account, plus interest accrued, shall be disbursed to the Clerk of the United States District Court of the Southern District of Illinois upon entry of this Order. 3. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue payment by check payable to the Clerk of the District Court and mailed to 750 Missouri Ave., East St. Louis, IL 62201. See full written Order. (JS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Given that Defendant Brenda Voss submitted correspondence #20 to the Court on August 15, 2022 which has now been filed on the docket and which the Court now construes as Defendant Voss's Answer, the Court's 10/3/2022 Text Order is vacated as to Defendant Voss. The Court further construes the filed correspondence from Defendants Mandurano #17 , Haas #18 , and Oliver #19 as those Defendants' Answers. Only Defendant Bourrt has failed to file an answer in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/2/2022. (KZ) Modified on 11/2/2022 (KZ). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Oliver to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Haas to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Mandurano to Plaintiff by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: The docket in this case reflects that each of the Defendants waived service of summons in this case, and their answers or other responsive pleadings were due by 8/16/2022. None of the Defendants has filed an answer. The Court sua sponte extends the Defendants' answer deadline to 10/17/2022. Failure to answer will result in default judgment being entered against the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to send this Text Order to the Defendants at the addresses listed in their executed Waivers of Service, #10 through #14 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/3/2022. (KZ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Deposit Funds Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/22/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. State Farm Lifes motion is hereby GRANTED; 2. Within thirty (30) days of State Farm Lifes receipt of this Order, State Farm Life hall issue a check payable to the Clerk, US District Court and mail to US District Court, Room 305, 100 NE Monroe, Peoria, Illinois 61602. A check equal to the sum of $12,077.00, representing the Death Benefit, plus any applicable interest; and 3. The Clerk of Court shall deposit said funds into an interest-bearing account pending further direction from the Court. (See Full Order) (AEM) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM Correspondence from Pro se Defendant Brenda Voss. (JS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Childers, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Farm Insurance Company. SANDY BOURRT waiver sent on 6/17/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. (Erickson, Heather) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Deposit Funds (Interpleader) with Incorporated Brief by Plaintiff State Farm Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Heather) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Joanie Oliver on 6/17/2022. (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Brenda Voss on 6/17/2022. (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Vicki Mandurano on 6/17/2022. (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sandy Bourrt on 6/17/2022. (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Marian Haas on 6/17/2022. (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Meghan Domenica White on behalf of State Farm Insurance Company (White, Meghan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3958750.), filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Application, #4 Exhibit C - Judgment, #5 Exhibit D - Obituary, #6 Exhibit E - Death Certificate, #7 Exhibit F - Marian Claim Form, #8 Exhibit G - Brenda 12-27-21 Corr, #9 Exhibit H - Brenda's 1-25-22 Corr)(Erickson, Heather) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather D. Erickson