This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2020 at 09:42:01 (UTC).

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Young et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 State Farm Fire Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Young. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Leann Young

Young Karma Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John E. Moore

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Richard Shane Strabala

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Joseph Robert Perry

Attorney at Daggett & Perry, PLLC

Post Office Box 389

Marianna, AR 72360-0389

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/28/2020. (jak) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#9

(#9) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response to Motion to Transfer filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 based on the attached correspondence. (jak) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

5 #1

Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2020)

#5

(#5) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Transfer Case to Delta Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Perry, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc (Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc Demand for Trial byJury (Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Copy of Insurance Policy

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Copy of Insurance Policy)(Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076823.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/28/2020. (jak) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response to Motion to Transfer filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 based on the attached correspondence. (jak) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Transfer Case to Delta Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Perry, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc (Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc Demand for Trial byJury (Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Copy of Insurance Policy)(Perry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076823.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less