This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:42:33 (UTC).

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. v. Miele Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 State Farm Fire Casualty Co filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Miele Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02593

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.

Defendant

Miele Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam S Long

Attorney at Barrick, Switzer, Long, Balsley & Van Evera

6833 Stalter Drive, First Floor

Rockford, IL 61108

Defendant Attorneys

William Seth Howard

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606

James A. Foster

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams Street, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 7/9/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Miele Incorporated(Howard, William) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Miele Incorporated by James A. Foster (Foster, James) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Miele Incorporated by William Seth Howard (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. by Adam S Long (Long, Adam) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Municipal Department, case number (12018 L 013006) filed by Miele Incorporated Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15727382. (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 7/9/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Miele Incorporated(Howard, William) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Miele Incorporated by James A. Foster (Foster, James) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Miele Incorporated by William Seth Howard (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. by Adam S Long (Long, Adam) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Municipal Department, case number (12018 L 013006) filed by Miele Incorporated Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15727382. (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIELE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Foster