Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2021 at 06:33:50 (UTC).

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Norcold Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Norcold Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah M Fine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08111

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah M Fine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

AMCO Insurance

Defendants

Norcold Incorporated

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Lee Moulton

Attorney at Moulton Law Firm PC

6401 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 101

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Defendant Attorneys

Barrett Neal Lindsey

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2761

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AMCO Insurance. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Norcold Incorporated. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19476263. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8111-PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Titled as: RULE 41(A) STIPULATION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BY AMICO INSURANCE WITH PREJUDICE AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL) from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number P1300CV202100082. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19476263 filed by Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AMCO Insurance. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Norcold Incorporated. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Norcold Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19476263. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8111-PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Demand for Jury Trial/Ceritificate re Compulsory Arbitration upon John Doe, Security Guard for Corporation Service Company (Statutory Agent) for Norcold Incorporated on 2/19/2021. (original filed in State Court on 3/4/2021). (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Titled as: RULE 41(A) STIPULATION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BY AMICO INSURANCE WITH PREJUDICE AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL) from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number P1300CV202100082. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19476263 filed by Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Norcold Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrett Neal Lindsey